Harris v. Uribe
Petitioner: Wayde Hollis Harris
Respondent: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01502
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/07/17 ordering Petitioner, who is represented by counsel, has filed a pro se request for judicial notice. 93 . This petition for writ of habeas corpus was dismissed and judgment was entered onOct ober 18, 2016. 88 , 89 . Documents filed by petitioner since the closing date will bedisregarded and no orders will issue in response to future filings. The Clerk of the Court shallserve a courtesy copy of this order to petitioner, Wayde Hollis Harris, CDCR #G-36394, at CSP Solano,P.O. Box 4000, Vacaville, CA 95696.(Plummer, M)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/17/16 granting 84 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus is denied as untimely. The court declines to issue the certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/4/16 ORDERING that 69 Motion to Dismiss and the August 10, 2016 hearing on the motion are VACATED. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of this order to file a new motion to dismiss with briefing to be completed as set forth in Local Rule 230(c) and (d).(Dillon, M)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/22/16 ordering the order to show cause filed 03/18/16 65 is discharged. The time for respondent to file and serve a response is extended to 4/25/16. (Plummer, M)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/18/16 ORDERING that within seven days from the date of this order, respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition for writ of habeas corpus or a motion to dismiss and shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to timely file the answer or motion to dismiss.(Dillon, M)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/24/13 ordering attorney Emry J. Allen is substituted as attorney for petitioner in place of attorney William L. Schmidt. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/28/2013 (Plummer, M).
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/26/13 DENYING 21 Motion to unseal Marsden Hearings. (Donati, J)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/22/13 ordering William L. Schmidt, Attorney at law, is substituted as counsel of record for Wayde Hollis Harris in place of Charles M. Bonneau Jr. (Plummer, M)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/12 re 14 Request; The time for filing the amended petition for habeas corpus is extended to 4/1/13. (Matson, R)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/3/2012 ORDERING that the deadline for filing a response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus is VACATED. Petitioner's 9 motion for leave to file an amended petition is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file an amended petition within 90 days of the date this order is issued. (Zignago, K.)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/3/12 ORDERING that within 30 days from the day this order is served, petitioner may submit either the filing fee or the application required by section 1915(a). Petitioners failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to petitioner a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayde Hollis Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?