Leon v. Tri Counties Bank
Plaintiff: Richard Leon, Jr.
Defendant: Tri Counties Bank
Case Number: 2:2012cv01529
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/30/14. Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1), the parties stipulate to a dismissal of this action with prejudice, pursuant to a Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/7/14 GRANTING 24 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. (Manzer, C)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/24/2014 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 24 Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Answer to 3/26/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/6/14 ORDERING that the deadline for completing expert discovery be extended to 2/14/14 and that Plaintiff be permitted to take the deposition of Craig Carney on 1/21/14. (Meuleman, A)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/17/13 ORDERING that the deadline for making expert witness disclosures shall be extended from November 19, 2013 to December 19, 2103 and the deadline for disclosing rebuttal experts shall be extended from November 26, 2013 to January 2, 2014. (Becknal, R)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/2013 ORDERING 17 Disclosure of Expert Witnesses Reset for 11/19/2013, Supplemental Disclosure 11/26/2013. Discovery due by 1/6/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/19/2014, Motion hearing for 3/19/2014 at 9:30 AM. Joint Pretrial Statement due 4/25/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez.(Reader, L)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/9/2013. (Zignago, K.)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/28/13 ORDERING that it is hereby stipulated by and between the parties hereto through their respective attorneys of record that Defendant may file an Amended Answer to Complaint. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED that Plaintiff waives service of the Amended Answer to Complaint. Attorneys for Defendant Tri Counties Bank to submit their Amended Answer to Complaint. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon v. Tri Counties Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri Counties Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Leon, Jr.
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?