Brewer v. Grossbaum et al
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Brewer
Defendant: Yossi Grossbaum, Kim Peterson, M. Elorza and S West
Case Number: 2:2012cv01555
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/17/16 Recommending that Defendant's 82 MOTION to DISMISS and revoke ifp be granted; and This Action be dismissed without prejudice, unless Plaintiff pays the full fi ling fee for this Action. ($400.00), by the deadline for filing objections to these Findings and Recommendations. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/17/14 ORDERING defendant's request for judicial notice 82 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 93 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion to revoke plaintiff's IFP status 82 be granted. This action be dismissed without prejudice, unless plaintiff pays the full filing fee for this action ($400.00) by the deadline for filing objections to these findings and recommendations. MOTION to DISMISS and revoke ifp 82 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/18/14 granting 83 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The 09/26/14 deadline for filing pretrial motions in this action as described in the court's discovery and scheduling order is vacated. The court will issue a revised deadline for filing pretrial motions if necessary after ruling on defendants' pending motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status under the 3 strikes rule. (Plummer, M)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/19/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 79 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/11/2014 ADOPTING IN FULL 69 Findings and Recommendations; ORDERING that this case proceed on the plaintiff's 61 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint; DISMISSING Defendants M. Elorza, S. West; DENYING 63 , 65 Motions to Join D. Thomason; DIRECTING the defendants to file an answer to the plaintiff's 61 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint within thirty days. (Michel, G)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/9/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 41 is denied as moot. If plaintiff chooses to file a second motion for summary judgment during these pro ceedings, he must comply with Local Rule 260 before the court will consider it; Defendants motion to dismiss 54 is DENIED as moot; Plaintiffs motion to dismiss and motion for entry of default and sanctions 59 & 62 are DENIED as moot; and Pl aintiffs motion for a court order 56 is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that: This case proceed on plaintiffs first amended complaint, specifically, plaintiffs First Amendment Free Exercise Clause claims against defendants Grossbaum and Peterson; Defendants Elorza and West be dismissed; Plaintiffs motions to join D. Thomason 63 & 65 be denied; and Defendants be directed to file an answer to plaintiffs amended complaint within thirty days. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/13/13 DENYING 49 and 52 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/23/2013 ADOPTING, in full, 44 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 29 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERING Defendants to file an Answer to the Complaint within 30 days. (Michel, G)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/15/13 ORDERING that Defendants motion to strike (Doc. No. 38 ) is denied as unnecessary; and Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a surreply (Doc. No. 39 ) is denied as unnecessary. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 29 ) be denied; and Defendants be directed to file an answer within 30 days. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/20/12 denying 24 Motion for damages. (Plummer, M)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kevin D. Brewer signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/21/2012. CDC is to collect monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Grossbaum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yossi Grossbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Elorza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?