Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC v. Savell
Plaintiff: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
Defendant: Eric Savell
Case Number: 2:2012cv01608
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/18/14: This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a), each party to bear their own fees and costs. (Kaminski, H)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER to STAY CASE signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/23/12. Joint status report due within 90 days. (Manzer, C)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 4 for Temporary Restraining Order signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/19/2012. Defendant Eric Savell is enjoined from committing, either directly or indirectly, and whether acting alone or in concert with others, pending arbitration before FINRA, or until further Order of Court. (Marciel, M)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/18/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's application to file documents under seal is DENIED without prejudice to an application to file under seal a document containing the customer-identifying information contained in Paragraph 7 of the Dunzweiler Declaration; parties are advised that at the TRO hearing the court does not plan to consider any of the declarations or evidence plaintiff submitted under seal on 6/15/2012; if plaintiff chooses to file a n ew application to seal, it shall do so no later than 6/18/2012 by 4:30 p.m.; if plaintiff chooses to file declarations in support of the TRO publicly, it shall do so no later than today (6/18/2012) at 4:30 p.m.; declarations shall contain ONLY inform ation already contained in the original declarations filed on 6/15/2012 and plaintiff shall effect electronic service on defendant's counsel no later than 4:30 p.m. today; plaintiff shall forthwith serve this order by electronic means on defendant's counsel, or on defendant, if counsel is unknown.(Waggoner, D)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/15/2012 ORDERING that this matter is now SET for hearing on Tuesday, 6/19/2012 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom Four of the undersigned judge. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve this order forthwith upon defendant&# 039;s counsel, if known, or upon defendant, if counsel is unknown. Service must be accomplished by electronic mail and any other means (for example, hand delivery), designed to ensure that defendant is notified of the hearing no later than 5:00 p.m. today (Friday, 6/15/2012). Defendant shall have until 3:00 p.m. on Monday, 6/18/2012, to file an opposition to plaintiff's 4 TRO application. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC v. Savell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
Represented By: M. Taylor Florence
Represented By: Krista Jean Dunzweiler
Represented By: Jennifer Kenedy, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Savell
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Edward S. Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?