Gupta v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Raj Christopher Gupta
Defendant: B. Barton, A. Perez, Dalinda Harman, D. Huser, Matthew Cate, Scott Kernan, Terri McDonald, George Giurbino, Fred Figueroa, Roger Blackshear, M. Williams, J. D. Lozano, S. Roacho, C. Vaca, B. Walls, E. Brooks and K. Pool
Case Number: 2:2012cv01693
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/9/14: Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED. (Kaminski, H)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/14/14 ORDERING that defendants request for a 30-day extension of time in which to file the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED. The Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice shall be filed on or before June 16, 2014.(Dillon, M)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/11/2014 ORDERING that in light of the notice of imminent dismissal of this case, all pending motions and deadlines are VACATED; pursuant to L.R. 160(b), the parties have 21 days to file the stipulation dismissing this case. (Yin, K)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/18/14 ordering Attorney Jacob B. Lee's application to appear pro hac vice for defendants Matthew Cate, Scott Kernan, Terri McDonald, George Giurbino, Fred Figueroa, A. Perez, Dalinda Harman, D. Huser, M. Williams, K. Pool and J.D. Lozano is hereby granted. (Plummer, M)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/4/2014 ORDERING the 67 Waiver of Service Executed for defendant Barton be SEALED. With respect to defendant Blackshear, his correct and current address, once obtained, will also be placed under seal. (Donati, J)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/4/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 55 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/08/14 granting 52 Motion to extend the discovery cut-off date from 1/15/14 to 2/14/14. (Plummer, M)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AMENDING 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/22/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiffs request to have defendants Blackshear and Barton served at their last known address as provided by defendants counsel (ECF No. 36 ) is GRANTE D on the terms that follow; Plaintiffs and defendants requests (ECF Nos. 36 , 37 ) for the addresses to be filed under seal will be DENIED for the parties failure to comply with the applicable rule for seeking a sealing order. Defendants counsel n eed not file the addresses; instead, the Clerk of the Court is directed to provide defendants with the USM-285 forms returned by plaintiff for service of defendants Blackshear and Barton; Counsel for defendants is then directed to fill in the last known addresses for those defendants and return the forms to the court forthwith so that the U.S. Marshal may be directed to serve the complaint upon them.(Donati, J)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/19/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs request to have defendants Blackshear and Barton served at their last known address as provided by defendants counsel (ECF No. 33 ) is granted on the terms that follow; Plaintiffs and defendants requests (ECF Nos. 33 , 34 ) for the addresses to be filed under seal will be denied for the parties failure to comply with the applicable rule for seeking a sealing order. Defendants counsel need not file the addresses; instead, the Clerk of the Court is directed to provide defendants with the USM-285 forms returned by plaintiff for service of defendants Blackshear and Barton; Counsel for defendants is then directed to fill in the last known addresses for those defendants and return the forms to the court forthwith so that the U.S. Marshal may be directed to serve the complaint upon them. (Dillon, M)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/15/2013 ORDERING that plainiff's 32 request to voluntarily abandon his motion for default judgment, is construed as a motion to withdraw the motion for default judgment, and is GRANTED; and the 26 motion for default judgment is VACATED. (Yin, K)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/20/13 ordering the petition for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice 29 of attorney Rachel Love is hereby granted. (Plummer, M)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/11/13 ordering the clerk of the court shall send to plaintiff 2 USM-285 forms, instruction sheet and a copy of the 6/25/12 complaint to be completed and returned within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/11/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 5 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee with an initial partial filing in accordance with the concurrent ord er to the Warden of North Fork Correctional Facility; plaintiff's claims of a due process violation in the imposition of the "P-code" classification status upon him are DISMISSED with leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days; upon filing an amended complaint or expiration of time allowed therefor, the court will make futher orders for service of process upon some or all of the defendants. (Yin, K)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/11/12 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gupta v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalinda Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Huser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Giurbino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Blackshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Roacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Vaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj Christopher Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?