Manning et al v. Crosby et al
Plaintiff: Lilly Manning, Kenyata Manning and Natasha Manning
Defendant: Mike Crosby, Rachel Lane, Mary Struhs, Natasha Johnson, Stephanie Whitney-Cook, Pauline Tracey, Lynn Tracy, Sacramento Unified School District, Sacramento County, Department of Health and Human Services and Child Protective Services
Case Number: 2:2012cv01784
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/1/2016 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 5/13/2016; ORDERING all parties to disclose expert witnesses by 6/28/2016; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 11/3/2016; CONF IRMING that Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statements be filed by 2/2/2017; CONFIRMING the Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; CONFIRMING the Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Michel, G.)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/1/2015 ORDERING 30 Discovery due by 4/1/2016; Expert Witness Disclosure due by 5/27/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 10/20/2016; Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement by 2/2/2017; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/9/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; and Trial reset for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Reader, L)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/2015. All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 6/1/2015. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/30/2015. All dispositiv e motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 12/10/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judg e Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 3/31/2016, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. The Jury Trial is SET for 6/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial length of 16 day. (Kastilahn, A)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/9/14: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/1/2015. Discovery due by 3/2/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/10/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/2013 ORDERING that this stipulation for a protective order will be enforced as an order of this court. This Stipulated Protective Order shall remain in full force and effect such that it may be enforced as a contract between the parties after the termination of this case, but the court will not retain jurisdiction after the termination of this case. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning et al v. Crosby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilly Manning
Represented By: Joseph C. George
Represented By: Joseph Charles George, Jr
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyata Manning
Represented By: Joseph C. George
Represented By: Joseph Charles George, Jr
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Manning
Represented By: Joseph C. George
Represented By: Joseph Charles George, Jr
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Crosby
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Lane
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Struhs
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Johnson
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Whitney-Cook
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Tracey
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Tracy
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Unified School District
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?