Friends of Tahoe Forest Access et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Friends of Tahoe Forest Access, Webilt Four Wheel Drive Club, Friends of Greenhorn, Nevada County Woods Riders, Grass Valley 4-Wheel Drive Club, High Sierra Motorcycle Club, David C. Wood and Kyra
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, United States Forest Service, Tom Tidwell, Randy Moore and Tom Quinn
Case Number: 2:2012cv01876
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/16/2014 OVERRULING 53 Objections to 52 Bill of Costs; GRANTING the defendants' costs; AWARDING costs in the amount of $14,875.23. (Michel, G)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/6/14 DENYING 31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 32 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment for the reasons stated in the transcript of the proceedings held on 48 . Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/8/2013 ORDERING 31 , 32 Motions Hearing CONTINUED to 11/14/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/5/13. (Meuleman, A)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 13 Notice of Related Case signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/1/12. Although both cases concern challenges to the Forest Service's management of off-road vehicles and involve similar questions of law, the challenged actions a ffect different geographical areas and involve review of entirely separate administrative records. Thus, assigning both cases to the same judge would not result in a substantial savings of judicial effort. The court DECLINES to reassign Friends of Tahoe Forest Access under Local Rule 123(c).(Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Tahoe Forest Access et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Tahoe Forest Access
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webilt Four Wheel Drive Club
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Greenhorn
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada County Woods Riders
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grass Valley 4-Wheel Drive Club
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Sierra Motorcycle Club
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Wood
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyra
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: M. Reed Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?