Holland v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Donald Holland
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 2:2012cv01983
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING Defendant's MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 80 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/2014 DENYING both plaintiff's 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and defendant's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Marciel, M)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: 43 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/10/14 ORDERING Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/16/2014. (Meuleman, A)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/31/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 31 motion to quash subpoenas is GRANTED IN PART. Steven Shultz shall produce documents in compliance with this order on or before 11/15/2013. (Zignago, K.)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/4/13: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/7/2014. Discovery due by 12/6/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/5/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/30/13. (Manzer, C)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/11/13. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/4/2013. Discovery due by 9/3/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/13/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Holland
Represented By: Daniel Scott Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?