Arnold v. County of Sacramento et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Defendant: Sunrise Recreation & Park District, Sacramento Public Library Authority and County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2012cv01998
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/16/2013 ORDERING that the case is DISMISSED with prejudice as to defendants County of Sacramento, Sacramento Public Library Aurhority and Sunrise Recreation and Park District. (Donati, J)
November 27, 2013 49 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of PLAINTIFF'S ACTION by Connie Arnold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Mary)
October 18, 2013 48 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Connie Arnold. (Lim, Mary)
September 11, 2013 47 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/10/2013 ORDERING that this Court hereby sets 10/21/2013 as the last day for Plaintiff to file her motion for attorneys' fees and costs. (Zignago, K.)
September 5, 2013 46 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Request to Set Filing Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs by Connie Arnold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Mary)
August 22, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER RE: CONSENT DECREE signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/22/2013 ORDERING that the stipulated consent decree for settlement of Plaintiff's injunctive relief claims only as to Defendants County of Sacramento and Sacramento Public Library Authority is ORDERED and shall be binding on Plaintiff Connie Arnold and Defendants County of Sacramento and Sacramento Public Library Authority and any successors in interest. The Court shall retain jurisdiction of this action to enforce provisions of this Consent Decree and Order. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Decree, # 2 Attachment A) (Zignago, K.)
August 6, 2013 44 CONSENT DECREE and Order for Settlement of Plaintiff's Injunctive Relief Claims Only as to Defendants County of Sacramento and Sacramento Public Library Authority by Connie Arnold. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lim, Mary) Modified on 8/8/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
July 10, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER re 42 Consent Decree signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/10/2013. The concurrently filed Stipulated Consent Decree for Settlement of plaintiff's Injunctive Relief claims only as to defendant Sunrise Recreation & Park District is ORDERED and shall be binding on plaintiff Connie Arnold and defendant Sunrise Recreation & Park District and any successors in interest.Court shall retain jurisdiction of action to enforce provisions of Consent Decree and Order. Sunrise Recreation & Park District is hereby TERMINATED from action. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Decree, # 2 Attachment A) (Marciel, M)
July 1, 2013 42 CONSENT DECREE and [PROPOSED] ORDER for Settlement of plaintiff's Injunctive Relief claims only as to defendant Sunrise Recreation & Park District by Connie Arnold. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Proposed Order) (Lim, Mary) Modified on 7/2/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 1, 2013 41 Featured Case STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/30/2013: All Discovery is left open, save and except that it shall be so conducted as to be completed by 10/29/2013. All Law and Motion shall be conducted so as to be completed by 12/29/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2014 at 3:30 PM and Court Trial set for 6/24/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). (Marciel, M)
April 29, 2013 40 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/29/2013. Discovery deadline set for 10/29/2013. Law & Motion deadline set for 12/29/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. 5 day Jury Trial set for 6/24/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Jeff Harrison present. Defendants Counsel Dirk Larsen, Jonathan Paul present. (Rivas, A)
April 25, 2013 39 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Connie Arnold re 35 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Jeff) Modified on 4/26/2013 (Kaminski, H).
April 15, 2013 38 STATUS REPORT by Sunrise Recreation & Park District. (Larsen, Dirk)
April 15, 2013 37 STATUS REPORT by County of Sacramento, Sacramento Public Library Authority. (Paul, Jonathan)
April 15, 2013 36 STATUS REPORT by Connie Arnold. (Lim, Mary)
February 6, 2013 35 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on January 15, 2013 re 33 ORDERING that a further Status Conference is SET for 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM. The parties shall file updated Status Reports no later than 4/15/2013. (Rivas, A)
January 24, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/24/2013, Added attorney Jonathan B. Paul for Sacramento Public Library Authority, attorney Kathleen T Rogan terminated. (Waggoner, D)
January 17, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/15/13 ORDERING that a further Status Conference is SET for 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM. The parties shall file updated Status Reports no later than 4/15/2013. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 16, 2013 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Substitution of Attorney for Sacramento Public Library Authority by County of Sacramento. (Paul, Jonathan)
January 14, 2013 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/14/2013. Further Status Conference set for 4/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Plaintiffs Counsel Jeff Harrison present. Defendants Counsel Mark Hazelwood, Jonathan Paul present. (Rivas, A)
December 4, 2012 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by CRD A. Rivas re 16 . The Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2012, is hereby CONTINUED TO 1/14/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Ordered by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on December 4, 2012. (Rivas, A)
November 21, 2012 29 STATUS REPORT by Sacramento Public Library Authority. (Rogan, Kathleen)
November 20, 2012 28 STATUS REPORT pursuant ot Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by Connie Arnold. (Lim, Mary) Modified on 11/20/2012 (Marciel, M)
November 20, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge *Allison Claire* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
November 19, 2012 26 STATUS REPORT by Sunrise Recreation & Park District. (Hazelwood, Mark)
November 19, 2012 25 INITIAL STATUS REPORT by County of Sacramento. (Paul, Jonathan) Modified on 11/19/2012 (Marciel, M)
November 9, 2012 24 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento.(Paul, Jonathan)
November 1, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/26/12: Added attorney Kathleen T Rogan for Sacramento Public Library Authority, attorney Lindsay Alida Goulding terminated. (Kaminski, H)
October 26, 2012 22 SECOND AMENDED SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sacramento Public Library Authority. (Rogan, Kathleen) Modified on 10/29/2012 (Meuleman, A).
October 26, 2012 21 AMENDED SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sacramento Public Library Authority. (Rogan, Kathleen) Modified on 10/29/2012 (Meuleman, A).
October 24, 2012 20 ANSWER to 7 First Amended Complaint by County of Sacramento; DEMAND for Jury Trial. Attorney Paul, Jonathan B. added. (Paul, Jonathan) Modified on 10/25/2012 (Marciel, M)
October 18, 2012 19 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sacramento Public Library Authority. (Rogan, Kathleen)
October 8, 2012 18 STATUS REPORT by Sunrise Recreation & Park District. Attorney Hazelwood, Mark Foster added. (Hazelwood, Mark)
October 5, 2012 17 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand by Sunrise Recreation & Park District.(Larsen, Dirk)
October 1, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/28/2012 GRANTING plaintiff's 13 Request for Continuance. Scheduling Conference is RE-SCHEDULED for 12/10/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). Parties shall file their Status Reports 14 days preceding Status Conference. (Marciel, M)
September 28, 2012 15 NOTICE of Change of Firm Information by all plaintiffs. Attorney Harrison, Jeff A added. (Harrison, Jeff) Modified on 10/1/2012 (Marciel, M)
September 26, 2012 14 ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sacramento Public Library Authority. Attorney Goulding, Lindsay Alida added.(Goulding, Lindsay)
September 21, 2012 13 REQUEST to continue Scheduling Conference and related dates by 45 days by Connie Arnold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Lim, Mary) Modified on 9/24/2012 (Kaminski, H)
September 20, 2012 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sunrise Recreation & Park District served on 9/6/2012. (Lim, Mary) Modified on 9/21/2012 (Manzer, C).
September 20, 2012 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 9/14/2012. (Lim, Mary) Modified on 9/21/2012 (Manzer, C).
September 20, 2012 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sacramento Public Library Authority served on 9/13/2012. (Lim, Mary) Modified on 9/21/2012 (Manzer, C).
September 20, 2012 9 ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sunrise Recreation & Park District. Attorney Larsen, Dirk Donald added.(Larsen, Dirk)
September 5, 2012 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sacramento Public Library Authority* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mary J. Lim* *139 Richmond Street* *El Segundo, CA 90245*. (Michel, G)
August 27, 2012 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Connie Arnold.(Kiang, Mary)
August 15, 2012 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sunrise Recreation & Park District served on 8/8/2012, answer due 8/29/2012. (Metz, Jordon)
August 15, 2012 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 8/8/2012, answer due 8/29/2012. (Metz, Jordon)
July 31, 2012 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP Form) (Donati, J)
July 31, 2012 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento, Sunrise Recreation & Park District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mary J. Kiang* *Barbosa Metz & Harrison, LLP* *17547 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 310* *Encino, CA 91316*. (Donati, J)
July 31, 2012 RECEIPT number #CAE200046245 $350.00 fbo Connie Arnold by Jordon Metz on 7/31/2012. (Donati, J)
July 31, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Connie Arnold. Attorney Kiang, Mary J. added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiang, Mary) Modified on 7/31/2012 (Donati, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Recreation & Park District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Public Library Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Represented By: Mary J. Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?