Kozacenko v. State of California
Plaintiff: Olegs Kozacenko
Defendant: State of California, California Highway Patrol, Andrew P. Murrill and J. Sherman
Case Number: 2:2012cv02196
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/22/15 ORDERING that the entire action, including all claims and counterclaims stated herein against all Defendants, is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The jury trial set for 02/08/16 is VACATED. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/25/2015 MODIFYING the 62 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order; STAYING this action pending mediation; ORDERING that a Status Conference be set for approximately two weeks after the mediation date of 7/13/2015; STAYING all formal discovery, except for the previously ordered physical and mental examinations of the plaintiff by Dr. McNiel, Dr. Keram, and Dr. Atkin; VACATING the relevant cut-off, to be reset at the post-mediati on Status Conference; ORDERING that any requests for reconsideration and/or objections to the 81 Order on Motions to Compel be filed by 7/31/2015; VACATING the cut-off dates for non-expert discovery and expert witness disclosure, to be reset at the post-mediation Status Conference, if necessary; CONFIRMING that the Jury Trial remain set for 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Michel, G.)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/13/2015 ORDERING Defendants' 64 motion to compel is GRANTED as stated on the record; and Plaintiff' 65 motion to compel is GRANTED as stated on the record. (Reader, L)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/11/15 ORDERING that the non-expert discovery cut-off is EXTENDED to 5/8/15. (Kastilahn, A)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/3/2014 VACATING the existing scheduling order and all dates included therein; INFORMING the parties that an amended scheduling order will follow. (Michel, G)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/3/2014 ORDERING that plaintiff's 45 motion to compel production of Form 268 is GRANTED. Within seven days of the date of this order defendants shall produce to plaintiff a copy of the Form 268 submitted to the court for in camera review. Production of the Form 268 shall be subject to a stipulated protective order. (Zignago, K.)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/26/14 54 . (Meuleman, A)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/13/2014. Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Compel responses to interrogatories is GRANTED as modified on the record. On or before 7/11/2014, defendants shall produce to plaintiff records of phone cal ls placed on requested defendants' personal cell phones relating to incident that is subject of action from the moment the incident began until midnight that same day. Defendants may redact all information related to any calls not relevant to in cident at issue and may redact unnecessary information as to relevant calls so long as receiver of call is identified. And within 7 days of date of this Order, defendants shall advise Court of date upon which Attorney General's Office first received Form 268 placed at issue by plaintiff's Motion to Compel and which has been submitted to Court for in camera review. (Marciel, M)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/17/14 MODIFYING 13 Scheduling Order. (Meuleman, A)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/9/13. (Kaminski, H)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/22/13: Defendants' request that plaintiff be prohibited from having access to the discovery produced pursuant to the court's previous order is denied and such a limitation shall not be included in the parties stipulated protective order. (Kaminski, H)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 21 MOTION to COMPEL signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/18/13. (Kaminski, H)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/8/2013. (Zignago, K.)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORRECTED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/25/13. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozacenko v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olegs Kozacenko
Represented By: Mark L. Venardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew P. Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?