Johnson v. Stanton, et al
Petitioner: Larry Dale Johnson
Respondent: Solano County Public Defenders Office, Gary R. Stanton and Tom Barrett
Case Number: 2:2012cv02239
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/24/2014 DISMISSING this action and the court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/18/14 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, petitioner shall file either an opposition to the motions to dismiss or a statement of no opposition. (Dillon, M)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/12/13 ORDERING that 26 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED; Respondent shall file a response to the first amended petition on or before February 7, 2014.(Dillon, M)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/13 ORDERING that Respondent shall show cause, in writing, no later than December 2, 2013, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file a responsive pleading; Respondent shall filed a response to the first amended petition no later than December 2, 2013; and The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Attorney. (cc US Atty) (Dillon, M)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/13/13 ORDERING that Petitioners January 22, 2013 motion 16 is GRANTED and the order and judgment (ECF Nos. 12 , 13 ) are set aside. The Clerk is directed to reopen the case. Respondent s hall file an answer or a motion in response to petitioners application within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order together with a copy of petitioners February 7, 2013 first amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus, with any and all attachments on the United States Attorney. (cc US Atty)(Dillon, M)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/03/12 DISMISSING CASE and all pending motions are denied as moot. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/24/12 denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting 7 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed with leave to amend. Petitioner has 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended petition. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner the court's 2241 habeas corpus petition form. (Plummer, M)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/30/12 ORDERING that within 30 days from the day this order is served, petitioner may submit either the filing fee or the IFP application. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to petitioner a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Stanton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Solano County Public Defenders Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary R. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Dale Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?