Porter v. Traquina
Plaintiff: Santana Porter
Defendant: Alvaro C. Traquina
Case Number: 2:2012cv02266
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/2017 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 4/13/2107 53 are ADOPTED in full; Plaintiff's motions for an extension of time 51 , 52 are DENIED; this case is STAYED u ntil Plaintiff completes his program at California Health Care Facility ("CHCF") and regains access to his legal property and a law library; Defendant's 12/16/2016 motion for summary judgment 47 is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal when the stay is lifted and the case re-opened; Plaintiff shall inform the Court when he completes his program at CHCF and regains access to his legal property and a law library; and the Clerk shall administratively close this case. (Becknal, R)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/12/17 recommending that plaintiff's motions for an extension of time 51 , 52 be denied. This case be stayed until plaintiff completes his program at CHCF and regains access to his legal property and a law library. Defendant's 12/16/16 motion for summary judgment 47 be denied without prejudice to its renewal when the stay is lifted and the case re-opened. Plaintiff be ordered to inform the court when he completes his program at CHCF and regains access to his legal property and a law library; and the clerk of the court be directed to administratively close this case. Motions 47 , 51 and 52 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/14/17 denying 49 Motion for a settlement conference. Plaintiff is reminded that he must file an opposition to defendant's summary judgment motion within 30 days of the court's March 2nd order. (Plummer, M)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/01/17 denying 46 Motion for a settlement conference. Within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff is advised that his opposition must adhere to the requirements described in the courts March 11, 2014 order and in the Notice attached to defendants motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/31/16 granting 43 Motion for modification of the discovery and scheduling order. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed within 60 days of the filed date of this order. Motions shall be briefed in accordance with paragraph 8 of this court's order filed 3/12/14. (Plummer, M)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/28/2016 ORDERING the custodian to produce Santana Porter AF-1689, to testify in USDC at 9:30 am on 6/29/2016 in courtroom 25, before Judge Kend all J. Newman; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/16/15 ordering that within 10 days of the date of service of this order, defendant shall file a status report in this case indicating how defendant intends to proceed. (Plummer, M)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/4/2015 GRANTING defendant's 29 motion to modify the court's discovery and scheduling order; defense counsel shall take plaintiff's deposition within 60 days and shall file any dispositive motion within 120 days of the date of this order; and except as provided in this order, the court's discovery and scheduling order remains in effect. (Yin, K)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/15/2014 GRANTING defendants's 16 motion to compel; plaintiff shall respond to defendant's interrogatories and request for production of documents within 30 days; DENYING defendant 9;s 16 request for sanctions; GRANTING defendant's 17 motion to vacate the deadlines for discovery and pretrial motions in the court's discovery and scheduling order; the parties may conduct discovery until 1/9/2015; pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 3/27/2015; and except as set forth in this order, the court's discovery and scheduling order issued on 5/20/2014, remains in effect. (Yin, K)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/03/14 ordering that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to defendant's motion to compel discovery. (Plummer, M)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Santana Porter signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/29/14. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Traquina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro C. Traquina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?