Toyebo v. Hubard
Petitioner: Damian Toyebo
Respondent: S. Hubard
Case Number: 2:2012cv02268
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/22/2014 ADOPTING 17 Findings and Recommendations in full and GRANTING 16 Motion to Dismiss. No Certificate of Appealability shall issue. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/14/14 recommending that respondent's motion to dismiss 16 be granted. MOTION to DISMISS 16 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/10/2012 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toyebo v. Hubard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Hubard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damian Toyebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?