Zinzuwadia v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Ashit Zinzuwadia |
Defendant: |
Nationwide Posting and Publication, Inc., American Mortgage Network, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., NDEX West LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Onewest Bank FSB |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02281 |
Filed: |
September 6, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
San Joaquin |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
12 U.S.C. § 1461 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 19, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/19/2013 ORDERING that the 12 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's 13 Second Amended Complaint, which is effecti vely plaintiff's third pleading, be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the undersigned's screening authority provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B). The Clerk of the Court be directed to close this case and vacate all future dates. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 12, 2013 |
Filing
12
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/12/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, no later than 7/26/13, why this case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute the action and failure to follow the court's order of 4/12/13 11 . On or before 7/26/13, plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint that addresses the issues raised in the court's screening order entered on 4/12/13 11 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/13 ORDERING that The First Amended Complaint 7 is DISMISSED. However, this dismissal is without prejudice, and plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. If he can do so in good faith, Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint within 45 days of the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/6/2013 DENYING, at this time, defendant American's 8 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
|
December 28, 2012 |
Filing
6
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/27/12. Amended Complaint due within 45 days. 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. To the extent Plaintiff intended his pleading to suffice as a request for a TRO, the request is procedurally improper and the request is therefore DENIED without prejudice to refiling. (Manzer, C)
|
October 18, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2012 DENYING, without prejudice, 3 Motion to Dismiss; VACATING the Motion Hearing as to 3 Motion to Dismiss set for 11/1/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Michel, G)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?