Taylor v. 144th Fighter Wing, et .al.
Plaintiff: Gary Taylor
Defendant: California National Guard, Defense Finance and Accounting Service, 144th Fighter Wing and California Air National Guard
Case Number: 2:2012cv02466
Filed: September 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/2/14. As the court made clear in its Order granting summary judgment, plaintiff is free to bring any other claim that the court has not disposed of in its summary judgment Order in a separate action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to amend be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. (Becknal, R)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/13: The Clerk shall replace ECF documents 39-3 and 40-2 with the recently- submitted version of the Declaration of Phillip C. Tincher, with its exhibits, and shall replace ECF documents 39-2 and 40-3 with the recently- submitted version of the Declaration of Gregory L. Outlaw, with its exhibits. (Kaminski, H)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER 54 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/26/13 ORDERING that defendants' time to reply to plaintiff's oppositions to defendants' dispositive motions is EXTENDED to 12/9/2013. Defendants' time to oppose plaintiff's motion to amend remains 12/2/2013 and plaintiff's time to reply in support of amendment remains 12/9/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/25/2013 ORDERING that the 52 Stipulation and Proposed Order will not be approved. Even though the hearing on the motion has been continued from 12/16/2013 to 12/30/2013, the court still needs to have the motion briefed by 12/9/2013. Accordingly, the request to extend defendants' time to oppose plaintiff's motion to amend filed 11/4/2013, is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/1/2013 ORDERING 45 the hearing on defendants' dispositive motions to dismiss 39 , 40 are CONTINUED to 12/16/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Opposition due by 11/4/2013, and any replies due by 12/2/2013. (Reader, L)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER 43 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/3/13 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' dispositive motions 39 , 40 is CONTINUED to 11/18/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, with oppositions due 10/1/2013, and replies due 11/4/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 41 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/16/2013 resetting hearing on 39 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION to DISMISS and 40 MOTION to DISMISS and MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT for 10/21/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Oppositions due 9/3/2013 and replies due 10/7/2013.(Kirksey Smith, K)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of time 37 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/30/2013: The time for response to the complaint by defendants DFAS, United States, Harry M. Wyatt II, David S. Baldwin, Mark Groves, and Teresa McKay, is EXTENDED until 8/5/2013. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend by 8/5/2013. Oppositions shall be filed by 8/19/2013, and replies, if any, shall be filed by 8/30/2013. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/17/13 EXTENDING time for response to the complaint by defendants United States, DFAS, Harry M. Wyatt II, David S. Baldwin, and Mark Groves until the date for defendant Teresa McKay's response to complaint, namely, 7/29/13. The time for unserved defendant Sami D. Said to respond to the complaint has not yet begun to run. (Meuleman, A)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/15/2013 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 7/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Pursuant to Local Rule 240, theparties shall submit to the court a Joint Status Report fourteen(14) calendar days prior to the hearing date. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/1/2013 ORDERING that the 27 Clarifying Stipulation is APPROVED. (Zignago, K.)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/21/13 GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Defendants 144th Fighter Wing, California Air National Guard and California National Guard terminated. (Manzer, C)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER 21 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/2013 approving the parties' stipulation to file the First Amended Complaint and to extend the time for response by defendants except the California Military Department, filed 1/25/2013. The First Amended Complaint hereby is FILED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. 144th Fighter Wing, et .al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Finance and Accounting Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 144th Fighter Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Air National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Taylor
Represented By: James Brock Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?