Schaldach v. Dignity Health, et. al.
Plaintiff: Linda M. Schaldach
Defendant: Dignity Health, Shelly Noyes, Dedra Bouchard, A.C. Saechou and Mercy Medical Group
Case Number: 2:2012cv02492
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 105/15 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 40 is GRANTED as to all claims. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/10/2015 ORDERING that the deadlines set by the Court in its 8/6/2015 Order remain in effect. Defendants' reply is due 8/20/2015. (Zignago, K.)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/17/2015 DENYING AS MOOT 42 Motion to Strike; VACATING the Motion Hearing on said motion set for 8/6/2015; DECLINING the plaintiff's request to impose sanctions. (Michel, G.)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/6/13 ORDERING for the reasons stated above, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 25 ) is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/23/2013 ORDERING that Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's fifth,sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth and eleventh causes of action is GRANTED WITH FINAL LEAVE TO AMEND as to all Defendants. If no amended complaint is filed within twenty (20) days of the date of this order, the causes of action dismissed by this order shall be dismissed with prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/7/2013. (Zignago, K.)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/20/2012 ORDERING that the 4 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's fourth, fifth, seventh and eighth causes of action is GRANTED with leave to amend as to all defendant. It is further ORDERED that 4 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first, second, third and sixth causes of action is also GRANTED with leave to amend as to the individual defendants. (Donati, J)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/21/12 GRANTING 5 Application for waiver of electronic filing requirement for this case only as to Plaintiff Linda M. Schaldach's counsel. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaldach v. Dignity Health, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Schaldach
Represented By: Robert R. Schaldach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Katherine L.M. Mola
Represented By: Nancy Joan Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Noyes
Represented By: Katherine L.M. Mola
Represented By: Nancy Joan Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedra Bouchard
Represented By: Katherine L.M. Mola
Represented By: Nancy Joan Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Saechou
Represented By: Katherine L.M. Mola
Represented By: Nancy Joan Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Medical Group
Represented By: Katherine L.M. Mola
Represented By: Nancy Joan Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?