United States of America v. Coleman et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America |
Defendant: |
Alan S Coleman and Staci E Coleman |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02519 |
Filed: |
October 9, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
John F. Moulds |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Taxes |
Cause of Action: |
26 U.S.C. § 7401 IRS: Tax Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
34
AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Alan S. Coleman signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/28/2014. (Michel, G)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
31
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/14 RECOMMENDING that the Motion for Default Judgment be granted, that judgment be entered against defendant Alan S. Coleman and that the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. Motion referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/22/14. The 26 Default Judgment and 25 Order Granting Default Judgment are VACATED and this matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Manzer, C)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
26
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Alan S. Coleman signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/25/2014. (Michel, G)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
24
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/9/14 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 20 motion for default judgment against defendant Alan S. Coleman be granted; judgment be entered against defendant Alan S. Cole man for individual income tax liabilities for the 2000, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005 and 2006 tax years in the amount of $543,878.88; that post judgment interest accrue on this award pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961; and this case be closed. Matter referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/12 ORDERING that the United States shall serve Defendants Alan and Staci Coleman by publication in the Vacaville Reporter and the Dixon Tribune; plaintiff must mail a copy of the summons, complaint a nd the order for publication if it learns defendants' address within the next sixty (60) days; the United States will file proofs of service upon Defendants Alan and Staci Coleman upon completion of service, either personally or by publication; the United States will serve by U.S. Mail copies of the summonses, related papers, and proofs of service at the address of Ms. Coleman's mother; to complete and effect service of process by publication and for good cause shown, the Order Setti ng (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference 2 deadlines are extended by 60 days. Amended deadlines follow here: (a) Friday, 3/8/13, for effecting service; (b) Monday, 4/1/13, for holding a Rule 26(f) conference; (c) Monday, 4/8/13, for filing a joint status report; and (d) Thursday, 4/18/13, for appearing in person for a status conference. (Becknal, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?