Perez v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations, etc.
Plaintiff: Branden Perez
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations, Prison Industry Authority
Case Number: 2:2012cv02654
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Brandon Perez signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/09/14. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/22/2013 GRANTING 8 Motion for Reconsideration construed as a Request for Relief form Judgment; REOPENING this action; GRANTING the plaintiff thirty (30) days to file a properly completed in forma pauperis application and trust account statement. (Michel, G)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/12. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/31/12 ORDERING that within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission and submit the following documents to the court: a. A complete A pplication to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and b. a certified copy of plaintiffs prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisone (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations, etc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branden Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations, Prison Industry Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?