Jekov v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia Jekov
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2012cv02768
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/24/13. Fees pursuant to the EAJA are awarded to plaintiff in the amount of $2600.00. (Manzer, C)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/26/13 ORDERING that fees pursuant to the EAJA are AWARDED to plaintiff in the amount of $2,798.40. (Kastilahn, A)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER for Voluntary Remand pursuant to sentence four 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/13. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/19/13 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a First Extension of time of 30 days to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment up to and including 9/18/2013. The parties further stipulate that the Court's Scheduling Order shall be modified accordingly. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/1/2013 ORDERING that the requested extension of plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 7/15/2013. All other deadlines are extended accordingly. (Zignago, K.)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/12 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further DIRE CTED to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the U.S. Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (cc: USM) (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jekov v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jekov
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Annabelle J. Yang, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?