Robinson v. San Joaquin County et al
Plaintiff: Anthony W. Robinson
Defendant: San Joaquin County, John Solis and San Joaquin County Employment and Economic Development Department
Case Number: 2:2012cv02783
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/10/2019 GRANTING County of San Joaquin's 227 request to add Stephanie MacDonald to its witness list. Ms. MacDonald will be permitted to testify in Defendant's case in chief. (York, M)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/7/19 GRANTING 223 REQUEST to redact Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits. (Kaminski, H)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/19 ORDERING that Plaintiff's objection to the use of his deposition at trial 205 is OVERRULED, without prejudice. The court will reconsider plaintiff's objection, if plaintiff can sufficiently demonstrate with documentation that Plaintiff submitted additional corrections to the court reporter and the corrections explicitly pertain to the portions of the deposition that defendant intends to offer at trial. (Kaminski, H)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/5/19 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 192 Motion in Limine, GRANTING 193 Motion in Limine, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 194 Motion in Limine, GRANTING 195 Motion in Limine, GRANTING 196 Motion in Limine and DENYING 197 Motion in Limine. (Kaminski, H)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/27/19 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court reassign this case to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties shall take note that all documents hereafter filed with the Clerk of the Court shall bear case number 2:12-cv-02783-CKD. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Judge England are hereby VACATED. (Becknal, R)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/22/2019 regarding 177 Request for Clarification, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to review 130 Memorandum Disposition where the appellate court remanded this case for further proceedings solely on Plaintiffs discrimination claim to the extent it is based on his 2009 performance review. (Washington, S)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/24/18 DENYING 151 Motion for Reconsideration. (Kaminski, H)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/11/2018 DENYING 164 Motion to Compel Further Discovery. (Hunt, G)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/23/18 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion to Compel further production of documents 145 is DISMISSED as moot. Pursuant to the court's Scheduling Order, ECF No. 138 at 2:9-20, discovery in this case is now closed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/12/18, ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is SET for 4/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows.(Kastilahn, A)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/13/2017 DENYING 139 Motion to Compel but may reserve in conformity with the instructions in this Order; Any further discovery propounded by plaintiff will be limited to the 2009 timeframe discussed; This discovery must be completed, as that term is defined in the Scheduling Order found at ECF No. 138, no later than April 5, 2018. (Hunt, G)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/4/2017 DENYING 137 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zignago, K.)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 134 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/30/17. (Kaminski, H)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/19/17. The Clerk of the Court shall reopen this case and serve the parties with a copy of this Court's Scheduling Order along with this Order; The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Scheduling Statement in conformity with this Order and the court's Scheduling Order within 30 days of this Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/5/15 ORDERING that Defendant's 121 request to seal documents is GRANTED IN PART. The Clerk is directed to SEAL only pages 22-30 of plaintiff's 118 objections. (Kastilahn, A)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/2/15 RECOMMENDING that the 51 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be granted. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/18/15 DENYING Plaintiff's renewed motion to appoint counsel, filed 1/13/15. The Clerk of the Court shall file plaintiff's 1/13/15 email in this action under seal. All future emails in this case will be disregarded. (Meuleman, A)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/28/2014 DENYING 104 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Privileged Documents; NOTIFYING all parties that the discovery period is now officially closed; NOTIFYING all parties that any future motions concerning discovery will be disregarded. (Michel, G)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/12/2014 ORDERING 101 that Plaintiff's 9/5/2014 motion for immediate delivery of documents DENIED without prejudice to its refiling as described herein; and should plaintiff decide to refile his motion to compel, he must do so within 14 days of this order, and notice it for hearing on the soonest available law and motion calendar by contacting the Courtroom Deputy, Danielle Eichhorn, at (916) 930-4152. (Reader, L)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/9/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff may file a supplemental opposition within thirty days of this order; Defendant may file a reply within forty-five days of this order; and The Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/13/14 is VACATED, as is the 1/5/15 Trial date. These dates will be rescheduled at a later time if necessary.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/31/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Compel is GRANTED insofar as it resolves the matters in this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 91 Motion for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/17/14. (Kaminski, H)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/26/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 78 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 77 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Defendant shall file an opposition to plaintiff's 67 motion to compel within fourteen days of the filed date of this order. Plaintiff may file a reply fourteen days thereafter. The matter will then be taken under submission, with a hearing to be scheduled only if necessary. (Zignago, K.)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/20/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion to compel further discovery responses, filed April 11, 2014, (ECF No. 67 ), is granted in part; Within seven days of this order, defendant shall pr oduce the Spectrum Consulting draft report to plaintiff. The report shall be used only for the purposes of this litigation and shall be returned to the County upon a final resolution in this case; In the event there is to be further need for the court's review of this report, the Clerk shall file the court's copy of the Spectrum Report under seal. (Becknal, R)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/14/2014 GRANTING-IN-PART 45 Motion to Compel. The EEOC shall produce all documents requested by the subpoena in unredacted form which reflect facts, names and identities, as described herein, within 7 days of this order. Clerk to serve this order on counsel of record for the EEOC. (Donati, J)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/9/14 ORDERING that the plaintiff complete and file an application to proceed IFP and a motion for appointment of counsel within 7 days. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an IFP form and this court's General Order number 188. (Manzer, C)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/16/14: Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery, filed April 11, 2014, 67 , is vacated from the law and motion calendar for May 8, 2014. Within seven days of this order, defendant shall submit the Spectrum Consulting Report in its possession directly to this court's chambers for in camera review. (Kaminski, H)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/8/14 ORDERING that Defendant's motion for summary judgment is vacated from the calendar for April 24, 2014, and will be rescheduled after resolution of plaintiff's motion to compe l; Plaintiff's motion to compel the EEOC's compliance with subpoena will instead be heard on April 24, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff may file a reply to the EEOC's opposition, if desired, by April 17, 2014. The scheduling order (ECF N os. 29 49 ) is modified to permit this hearing. The hearing will be held in Courtroom #8; The Clerk is directed to serve this order on counsel of record for the EEOC at the address indicated in its filing. The EEOC's request for a telephonic appearance is granted, and they shall contact the courtroom deputy, Danielle Eichhorn, at 916-930-4152 with the land-line number at which they can be reached. (Becknal, R)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/4/2014 ORDERING that the 61 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. EEOC's 60 motion for leave of court to file an untimely opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED, and the EEOC's opposition is ACCEPTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this order on counsel of record for the EEOC at the address indicated in its filing. (Zignago, K.)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/2/2014 ORDERING within 14 days of this order, the EEOC shall SHOW CAUSE for its failure to file an opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents in compl iance with subpoena, filed 3/11/2014, and shall file a response to the motion; Clerk is directed to serve this order on Mike Baldanano, Scott Doughtie, and Malcolm Loungway, at United States EEOC; within 7 days of this order, plaintiff shall file signed and dated copies of the two subpoenas served on the EEOC. (Waggoner, D)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/19/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 46 "motion to extend discovery and final law and motion calendar" is GRANTED and the 3/27/2014 hearing is VACATED. The discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 4/24/2014; motions to compel discovery shall be timely noticed to be heard by 4/10/2014. Law and motion deadline is EXTENDED to 5/22/2014. Within seven days of this order, plaintiff shall file copies of the two subpoenas served on the EEOC, as well as a listing of the documents already produced by this non-party. The 4/3/2014 hearing remains on the undersigned' s 10:00 a.m. law and motion calendar until further notice. (Zignago, K.)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/24/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel further responses, filed 1/28/14 35 is GRANTED in part; Within ten court days of the hearing, defendant shall file and serve verificati ons to its responses to documents requests numbered 4, 9 and 11; a privilege log to support its objections to production of responses to documents requests numbered 1 and 3; a declaration supporting its burden objection to request number 1; and a response to interrogatory number 12. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to preserve evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/29/13. (Kaminski, H)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/13/13: Discovery due by 3/27/2014, Motions to compel discovery are to be noticed to be heard by 2/27/2014, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/16/2014, Supp lemental/rebuttal experts due by 2/6/2014, all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be completed on or before 4/24/2014, Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., Jury Trial set for 1/5/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/5/2013 ADOPTING 21 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING, in part, 9 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING, with prejudice, Defendant Solis; DISMISSING all state law claims; ORDERING Defendant San Joaquin County to file an answer to the Title VII claim within 28 days. (Michel, G)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/30/2013 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 9 motion to dismiss be granted in part; defendant Solis be dismissed with prejudice from this action and defendant County be ordered to file an answer to the Title VII claim within 28 days of an order adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/24/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Proceed IFP 2 is GRANTED; Service is appropriate for the defendants named in this action. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within ninety days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 4, including a copy of this Court's status order, without prepayment of costs. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff one USM -2 85 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge, and this Court's Status Order. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814, Tel. No. (916) 930-2030.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. San Joaquin County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony W. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County Employment and Economic Development Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?