Conservation Congress v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 2:2012cv02800
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/18/2014 OVERRULING Plaintiff's 95 Objections to 92 Bill of Costs; AWARDING costs to the defendants in the amount of $9,502.12. (Michel, G)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/5/14 DENYING 97 Motion for Injunction. (Manzer, C)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/16/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims 1 through 6 of the First Supplemental Complaint 33 is DENIED. Defendants' 68 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant Intervenors' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 81 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is MOOT and the Court does not reach this issue. (Kastilahn, A)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/16/2013 ORDERING the court hereby imposes a monetary SANCTION of $250 to be paid to the Clerk of the Court by Plaintiff counsel Marianne Dugan within 14 days of the issuance of this order. The sanction is personal to counsel, and is not to be borne by her client. (cc: financial unit) (Waggoner, D)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Motion re page limit signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/2/13: Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' cross-motion for summary judgment and memorandum in support, and response to Plaintiff's mo tion for summary judgment shall be filed on January 13, 2013. Plaintiff may file a response/opposition on or before January 17, 2013 at 5:00 pm. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing within 7 days of the entry of this order, as to why it should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500.00 for failure to comply with this Court's orders. (Kaminski, H)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2013 GRANTING 47 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDERING that the plaintiff file its Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/20/2013; ORDERING that the defendants a file their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and their opposition to the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/23/2013; ORDERING that the plaintiff file its reply to the defendants' opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment and its opposition to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 1/3/2014; ORDERING the defendants to file their reply to the plaintiff's opposition to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 1/13/2014. (Michel, G)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/14/13 GRANTING 14 Motion to Intervene and APPROVING Stipulation to Stay Litigation. (Meuleman, A)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/9/2013 ORDERING 7 that this Court DECLINES to relate case(s) 2:11-CV-2605 LKK EFB and 2:12-CV-2800 GEB CKD. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Congress v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?