January 5, 2015 |
Filing
72
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs request to voluntarily dismiss this action 69 is granted; and this action is dismissed. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/15/14 ORDERING that defendants notify this court, within seven days, whether they have any objection to the dismissal of this action. Should defendants fail to respond, plaintiffs request will be granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), unless plaintiff informs the court, within seven days from the date of this order, that the court has somehow misconstrued plaintiffs request for dismissal. (Dillon, M)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/26/14 ORDERING that plaintiffs motions (ECF Nos. 53 and 57 ) are granted; Plaintiffs August 22, 2014 opposition is deemed timely filed; Defendant Dernoncourts reply to the motion for summa ry judgment, if any, shall be filed within fourteen days from the date of this order; The July 9, 2014 stipulation (ECF No. 59 ) is approved; The discovery deadline is extended to August 1, 2014, nunc pro tunc; and the pretrial motions deadline, ex cept for motions to compel discovery, is extended to October 31, 2014; Plaintiffs May 16, 2014 motion to extend the discovery deadline (ECF No. 43 ) is denied as moot; and Plaintiffs motion to be present during his wifes deposition (ECF No. 51 ) is denied as moot.(Dillon, M)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/2014 AFFIRMING the decision of the magistrate judge re 30 Order denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Michel, G)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/2014 DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's 37 motion for general authorization to attend depositions noticed by defendants; GRANTING plaintiff's 38 request to obtain four blank subpoenas duces tecum and the Clerk shall send plaintiff four blank subpoenas duces tecum with instructions; and plaintiff's 33 request for reconsideration remains pending before the district judge. (Yin, K)
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/16/2014 DENYING, without prejudice, defendant Dernoncourt's 19 motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; defendant may file and serve, within 30 days, a motion for summary judgment that includes notice to plainitff of the evidentiary requirements for opposing the motion. (Yin, K)
|
March 17, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/17/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 27 request for an extension of time, and plaintiff shall file and serve his opposition to defendant Dernoncourt's motion to dismiss on or before 4/15/20 14; plainitff's 26 request for judicial intervention is GRANTED, and defendants' counsel shall query the CDCR to ascertain the current business or home address of defendant Boyd as instructed in this order; defendants' counsel is REMINDED of the 14-day deadline for filing and serving a statement concerning the transfer of plaintiff's legal materials; and plaintiff's 28 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
|
March 3, 2014 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/28/14 ORDERING that counsel for defendants are directed to contact the appropriate officials at HDSP and KVSP to facilitate the immediate transfer of all plaintiffs legal materials in this action, and to file and serve a statement within 14 days informing the court of the current status of this matter. (Dillon, M)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/7/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff one USM-285 form, along with an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed November 29, 2012; Within sixty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and submit the attached Notice of Submission of Documents to the court, with the following documents: One completed USM-285 form for defendant Boyd; One copy of the endorsed complaint filed November 29, 2012 (the United States Marshals Office has already retained a copy for its records); and One completed summons form.(Dillon, M)
|
December 20, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/2013 ORDERING that the 12 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Defendants Swarthout, Freeze, Hardy, Foston, and Allen are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 24, 2013 |
Filing
12
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/2013 RECOMMENDING that defendants Swarthout, Freeze, Hardy, Foston, and Allen be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/18/13 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Andres Williams to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders ) (Dillon, M)
|