Pearson Education, Inc., v. Alahmad et al
Plaintiff: Pearson Education, Inc.
Defendant: Mamoon Alahmad, Zeina Sidaqui, Koogix and BOA Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv02936
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED JUDGMENT - MAJDOLENE QASIM signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/13. (Kaminski, H)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/28/2013 GRANTING 21 Motion of Breyon Davis to Withdraw as Attorney for Zeina Sidaqui. (Donati, J)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/16/2013 ORDERING that Sidaqui's and Koogix's 6 motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims for fraud/intentional misrepresentation is DENIED. Sidaqui's and Koogix's motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims for breach of contract is GRANTED, with leave to amend. Any amended complaint must be filed within twentyone (21) days of this order. Sidaqui's and Koogix's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Unfair Competition Law claims is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson Education, Inc., v. Alahmad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearson Education, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Stusiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamoon Alahmad
Represented By: Breyon Jahmai Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeina Sidaqui
Represented By: Breyon Jahmai Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koogix
Represented By: Breyon Jahmai Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?