McKeen-Chaplin v. Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Plaintiff: Gina McKeen-Chaplin
Defendant: Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Case Number: 2:2012cv03035
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/29/18 ORDERING this case DISMISSED with each party to bear its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/18/18. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/4/17 ORDERING Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiffs on August 1, 2017 is VACATED since the entry of summary judgment in favor of Plaintiffs on July 31, 2017 does not resolve all issues in this case. Further, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another district judge in light of cases the undersigned judge is handling as a senior judge. (Becknal, R)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/1/2017 DENYING as MOOT 111 Motion to Vacate. (Washington, S)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 AMENDED JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/28/2017 VACATING 102 Judgment; ENTERING Summary Judgment for the plaintiff, Gina McKeen-Chaplin and the mortgage underwriters in accordance with the 112 USCA Opinion and 113 USCA Mandate. (Michel, G.)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/12/15 ORDERING that each Plaintiff's Summary Judgment is DENIED and Provident's Motion is GRANTED; Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 7/7/15 ORDERING that the Final Pretrial Order filed on 5/15/15 is VACATED, and the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order filed on 11/19/13 is amended as follows: the parties' supplemental brie fing schedule on the referenced cross motions for summary judgment is adopted as follows: supplemental briefs shall be filed no later than 7/24/15, and any reply briefs shall be filed no later than 7/31/15; the hearing on the motions is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 8/11/15; a final pretrial conference is scheduled in courtroom 10 at 11:00 a.m. on 10/19/15, the parties shall file a further JOINT pretrial statement no later than seven (7) calendar days prior to the final pretrial conference; and trial commences at 9:00 a.m. on 12/1/15, in courtroom 10. (Kastilahn, A)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 4/17/2015 DENYING plaintiffs' 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Provident's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Marciel, M)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/16/15. The Clerk is directed to substitute the redacted Exhibit 1 in place of the exhibit filed on 3/2/15. (Manzer, C)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/4/2015 ORDERING that Defendant's 53 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 52 motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Zignago, K.)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 USCA ORDER as to 26 Petition for permission to file Appeal from 25 Order granting Motion to Certify Class: the 9th Circuit is DENYING the Petition (Marciel, M)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER decertifying plaintiff's class under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(c)(1)(C) and DENYING defendant's 30 Motion to Stay as moot signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/29/2013. (Marciel, M)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/4/13: The Parties' proposed Judicial Notice is APPROVED. (Kaminski, H)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/9/13 GRANTING 16 Motion to Certify Class. (Manzer, C)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER amending 14 Order signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/18/2013 ORDERING that the parties' proposed briefing schedule concerning the three referenced motions is ADOPTED, as follows: Plaintiff's motion for condition al class certification under the FLSA and Defendant's motion to deny supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims shall be filed no later than 5/20/2013; Plaintiff's motion for class certification of her state law claims shall be filed no later than 7/22/2013. These motions shall be noticed for hearing on the earliest available regularly scheduled law and motion hearing dates. (Zignago, K.)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/11/2013 ORDERING that the proposed briefing schedule concerning the three referenced motions is ADOPTED, as follows: Plaintiff's motion for conditional class certification under the FLSA and Defendant's motion to deny supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims shall be filed no later than 5/20/2013; Plaintiff's motion for class certification of her state law claims shall be filed no later than 6/22/201 3. These motions shall be noticed for hearing on the earliest available regularly scheduled law and motion hearing dates. Further, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/18/2013, is CONTINUED to 9/16/2013, at 9:00 a.m. A JOINT status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKeen-Chaplin v. Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina McKeen-Chaplin
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Represented By: Michael Lester Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?