Washington v. Essex et al

Plaintiff: Tracye Benard Washington
Defendant: C. Essex and C. Banyas
Case Number: 2:2012cv03054
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/20/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Tracye Benard Washington T-81075, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 8/20/2018 in courtroom 6, before D istrict Judge John A. Mendez; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
June 19, 2018 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/18/18 DENYING 86 , 106 plaintiff's motions for the appointment of an expert witness and DENYING 116 motion for sanctions. (Plummer, M)
May 31, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/30/2018 ADOPTING 105 findings and recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
April 27, 2018 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 98 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/26/18 DENYING without prejudice 94 95 Motions for Injunctive Relief. (Benson, A.)
April 10, 2018 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/5/2018 ORDERING Counsel for defendants to contact the Litigation Coordinator at CHCF to determine whether plaintiff has access to his personal legal property and w ithin 14 days after the filing of this order, file and serve a statement reflecting the findings; DENYING without prejudice 102 Request for Appointment of Counsel; and RECOMMENDING 100 Motion for Protective Order be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
January 24, 2018 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/23/2018 ORDERING Counsel for defendants to inform the court where plaintiff is currently housed, contact the Litigation Coordinator where Plaintiff is currently hou sed to determine what, if any, access Plaintiff currently has to the law library, legal materials, and photocopying, and within 21 days after the filing date of this order, file and serve a statement reflecting the findings of such inquiry; DENYING w ithout prejudice 94 Request for Appointment of Counsel; and RECOMMENDING 94 and 95 Requests for Injunctive Relief for a court order directing him returned to prison be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
January 5, 2018 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/5/2018 ORDERING 88 pretrial order is amended on page 6, lines 17-18 should read as, "Whether defendants were justified in involuntarily medicating plaintiff on March 18, 2012 and April 4, 2012." and amended on page 12, lines 12-13 should read as, "Jury Trial is set for May 21, 2018 at 09:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before the Honorable John A. Mendez." (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/15/17. (Plummer, M)
May 19, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/18/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 3/10/2017 (ECF No. 71 ) are ADOPTED in full; and Defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 63 ; 64 ) are DENIED. (Becknal, R)
March 10, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/09/17 recommending that defendants' motions for summary judgment 63 , 64 be denied. Motions 63 and 64 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 2, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/1/16. (Kastilahn, A)
May 25, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/25/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for issuance of a subpoena 44 is DENIED as having been rendered moot; Plaintiff's motion to compel further discovery 47 is DENIED; Pl aintiff's motion for an order barring defendants from participating in further discovery 59 is GRANTED. With respect to the documents defense counsel has submitted for in camera review, the court has determined that defendant Dr. Essex m ust produce certain documents to plaintiff. The court will order that any documents disclosed be subject to a protective order. Within 30 days of the date of this order, defense counsel shall submit a proposed protective order to this court. (Dillon, M)
April 1, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/31/2016 ORDERING that the 53 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Defendant's 41 motion to strike plaintiff's claim for punitive damages is DENIED. This case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
March 1, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/1/16 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action. It is RECOMMENDED that defendants' motion to strike plaintiff's claim for punitive damages (Doc. No. 41 ) be denied. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 25, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/25/15 ordering within 14 days of the date of this order, defense counsel shall clarify whether she represents both defendant doctors in this action. If defense counsel only represents defendant Dr . Essex, the court directs counsel to make an informal inquiry as to whom, if anyone, represents defendant Dr. Banyas in this action and report back to this court regarding that issue. Plaintiff's motions to compel 27 and 31 are denied exce pt that within 30 days of the date of this order, defendant Dr. Essex shall submit to the chambers of the undersigned for in camera review responsive documents (set two) Nos. 1,5,10, and 13-14. Defendant Dr. Essex's submission shall be accompan ied by a detailed log that: 1) describes the submitted documents, and 2) sets forth the defendant's argument, including citation to specific legal authority, for withholding the documents (or portions of documents) at issue from plaintiff. The c ourt will then determine whether it is appropriate to order the defendant to produce the documents, whether in unredacted or redacted form and/or subject to a protective order. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 26 is denied. (Plummer, M)
November 20, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/19/13 denying 15 Motion for a court order. (Plummer, M)
August 21, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/21/13 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Tracye Washington to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
January 8, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/7/13 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Essex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracye Benard Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Essex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Banyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?