Downs v. California Attorney General
Plaintiff: Gregory Downs
Defendant: California Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2012cv03057
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/10/14 ordering plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel 58 is denied. The court notes plaintiff is appealing the decision by this court to dismiss this case. Therefore, any further requests for the appointment of counsel should be directed to the Ninth Circuit. (Plummer, M)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/17/14 ORDERING that plaintiffs February 28, 2014 motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 52 ) is denied.(Dillon, M)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/10/04 ORDERING that Plaintiff's REQUEST to AMEND this Court's Judgment 52 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/3/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 47 motion requesting recusal of the magistrate judge and plaintiff's 48 request for a stay.(Yin, K)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/3/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 42 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED; plantiff's 42 request for an extension of time is GRANTED; plaintiff has 30 days to fil e and serve objections to the 11/1/13 findings and recommendations; plaintiff's request to be transferred to the Sacramento County Jail is DENIED; plaintiff's request that the court hold a hearing is DENIED; and plaintiff's 43 request for issuance of a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum is DENIED. (Yin, K)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/31/13 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/24/13 ordering plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file his amended complaint. All other requests made in plaintiff's 09/18/13 motion 36 are denied. (Plummer, M)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Gregory Downs signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/4/2013. CDCR is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/01/13 vacating 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 16 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Plummer, M)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/1/2013 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk to send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff's failure to comply will result in the court's 2/6/13 findings and recommendations being submitted to the district court judge assigned to this case for consideration.(Yin, K)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/6/13 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court assign a district court judge to this case; and it is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/26/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. California Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?