AT&T Mobility, LLC v. Yeager, et al.
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Defendant: Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Connie Bowlin, Lesser Law Group, Charles E. Yeager, Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C., Aviation Autographs, Ed Bowlin and de la Pena & Holiday, LLP
Counter Claimant: Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Intervenor: Parsons Behle & Latimer
Case Number: 2:2013cv00007
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 422 NOTICE of Non-Designation of Reporter's Transcript by Charles E. Yeager, Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT re #419 Notice of Appeal. (Williams, Jon) Modified on 12/15/2020 (Kaminski, H).
November 18, 2020 Filing 421 USCA CASE NUMBER 20-17253 for #419 Notice of Appeal filed by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT, Charles E. Yeager. (Coll, A)
November 16, 2020 Filing 420 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #419 Notice of Appeal filed by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT, Charles E. Yeager. Notice of Appeal filed *11/12/2020*, Complaint filed *1/2/2013* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *10/15/2020*. Court Reporter: *ECRO*. *Fee Status: Paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Reader, L)
November 12, 2020 Filing 419 NOTICE of APPEAL by Charles E. Yeager, Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT as to #418 Judgment. Attorney Williams, Jon R. added. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-9238604) (Williams, Jon)
October 15, 2020 Filing 418 JUDGMENT dated *10/8/2020* ENTERED pursuant to order signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2020 ORDERING that Parsons Behle's motions to enforce the settlement agreement are GRANTED. All claims in the Complaint-in-Intervention (ECF No. #93 ) are DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court enters FINAL JUDGMENT in AT&T Mobility, LLC v. Yeager et al., No. 2:13-cv-00007-KJM-DAD, GRANTING General Yeager and Victoria Yeager exclusive rights to the interpleader funds held by the court and directing that such funds be released to the Yeagers upon entry of this FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Yeager v. Parsons Behle & Latimer, LLP, et al., No. 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB is DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. In the No. 2:13-cv-00007 action, this order resolves ECF No. #410 . The motions for electronic filing privileges and to amend the answer pending at ECF No. #391 and ECF No. #392 are DENIED as MOOT. In the No. 2:14-cv-02544 action, this order resolves ECF No. #92 . The motion to dismiss at ECF No. #71 is DENIED as MOOT. (cc: Financial Dept) (Kastilahn, A)
November 15, 2019 Filing 414 REPLY by Parsons Behle & Latimer to RESPONSE to #410 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,. (Bond, Brook)
November 14, 2019 Filing 413 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (ECF No. #410 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 11/22/2019 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. The Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. #412 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
November 13, 2019 Filing 412 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re #411 Opposition to Motion filed by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT, #409 Response filed by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT, #410 Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement filed by Parsons Behle & Latimer by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
November 1, 2019 Filing 411 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT to #410 Motion to enforce settlement. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 11/4/2019 (Becknal, R).
October 17, 2019 Filing 410 MOTION for ENFORCEMENT of SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cory D. Sinclair, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Bond, Brook) Modified on 10/18/2019 (Coll, A).
October 16, 2019 Filing 409 RESPONSE by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT to 408 Minute Order,. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
October 9, 2019 Filing 408 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Plaintiff, Victoria Yeager is ordered to provide, within seven days, verification by letter briefly confirming that she authorized Defendant's Counsel, Brook B. Bond of Parsons Behle & Latimer, PLC to sign on her behalf the Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint-in-Intervention With Prejudice and Entry of Final Judgment, ECF No. #407 . (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 8, 2019 Filing 407 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Complaint-in-Intervention With Prejudice and Entry of Final Judgment by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bond, Brook) Modified on 10/9/2019 (Coll, A).
October 2, 2019 Filing 406 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT held on 10/2/2019. Plaintiffs, counsel for parties, the Court present and connected by conference call. After discussions with the Court regarding the pending settlement and issues in the case, the Court ORDERED the stipulated dismissal documents filed by Tuesday, 10/8/2019 in plaintiffs other case 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB. Order to issue in 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB case regarding further issues addressed at the teleconference. Plaintiffs' Counsel Victoria Yeager (Pro Se) and James Houpt (Guardian Ad Litem) present. Defendant's Counsel Raymond Etcheverry and Cory Sinclair present. (Waldrop, A)
September 30, 2019 Filing 405 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/30/2019: On the Court's own motion, an informal telephonic conference re: settlement is set for 10/2/2019 at 2:00 PM. The parties are instructed to call 5 minutes prior to the hearing into the Court's conference line. Telephonic appearance instructions will be emailed to parties. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
September 30, 2019 Filing 404 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL terminating Kenney K. Luvai by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 10/1/2019 (Benson, A.).
September 12, 2019 Filing 403 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/12/2019: After reviewing a request from plaintiff regarding an extension of time to file dismissal documents, the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED to 9/30/2019. No further extensions of time will be granted. Failure to comply with this deadline may result in sanctions. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
July 18, 2019 Filing 402 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT held on 7/18/2019. Counsel for defense and Guardian Ad Litem for Charles E. Yeager, James Houpt present. Plaintiff, Victoria Yeager present and appearing by telephone. The Court and parties discussed the settlement terms of the case. Dispositional documents in this case and 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB to be filed within 45 days. Plaintiffs Counsel Victoria Yeager (Pro Se) present. Defendants Counsel Raymond Etchevery and Cory Sinclair present. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Waldrop, A)
July 11, 2019 Filing 401 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/2019: Pursuant to the defendant's request (ECF No. #400 ), a Status Conference Re: Settlement is set for 7/18/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties shall file a joint letter briefly explaining what meet and confer efforts they have undertaken and providing a synopsis of the settlement issues by 12:00 PM on 7/17/2019. The joint letter brief shall be no more than 2 pages in length, including any exhibits or attachments, and shall be in at least 12-point type. Pages exceeding this limit will not be considered. The parties may all appear by telephone. If appearing by telephone, the parties are instructed to call 5 minutes prior the hearing into the conference line 1-888-363-4734 and use the access code 1245690 plus # and security code 4223 plus # when prompted. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
July 9, 2019 Filing 400 REQUEST for STATUS CONFERENCE with settlement judge by Parsons Behle & Latimer re (#397) Minutes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Benson, A.).
June 7, 2019 Filing 398 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/7/2019: At the request of parties the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED 30 days. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
April 23, 2019 Filing 397 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 4/23/2019 in related case 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB: Victoria Yeager and Charles Yeager present. Formally appointed Guardian Ad Litem for Charles Yeager and appointed for the limited purposes of settlement conference, attorney James Houpt present. Counsel for Parsons Behle & Latimer, Raymond Etcheverry and Cory Sinclair present. After discussions with the Court, parties reached a verbal settlement as to this case and case 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB. Terms of the settlement stated on the record by the Court. All pending dates are vacated. Dispositional documents to be filed within 45 days. The Court noted that Mr. Bond is the attorney of record for defendants in case 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB, but in light of Mr. Etcheverry and Mr. Sinclair from the defense firm being present and having full settlement authority, Mr. Bond did not need to be present for the settlement conference and did need to appear by telephone. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Waldrop, A)
April 9, 2019 Filing 396 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motion to Amend (ECF No. #392 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 4/19/2019 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
April 5, 2019 Filing 395 REPLY by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT re #393 Response, #390 Order, #392 Motion for Discovery. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
March 29, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Todd Michael Noonan. (Noonan, Todd)
March 29, 2019 Filing 393 RESPONSE by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #392 Motion for Discovery. (Bond, Brook)
March 15, 2019 Filing 392 MOTION to AMEND ANSWER, REQUEST FOR JURY; REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR ORDER RE EXPERT TESTIMONY by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 3/18/2019 (Coll, A). Modified on 4/8/2019 (Owen, K).
February 25, 2019 Filing 391 MOTION to be ELECTRONIC FILER by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Benson, A.)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/14/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED #384 In light of this court's Pre-Filing Review Order, the Clerk of Court is directed to file Mrs. Yeager's supplemental motion and reply as allowed by this order upon receipt.(Reader, L)
January 11, 2019 Filing 389 EXHIBIT LIST by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT.(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
December 20, 2018 Filing 388 RE-SUBMITTED EXHIBIT LIST by Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 1/15/2019 (Reader, L).
December 13, 2018 Filing 387 MINUTES for FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/13/2018. Attorney, Kennedy Luvai, present for Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Pro Se Litigant, Victoria Yeager, present. The court and counsel discussed further case scheduling and motion practice. Upon request of Mr. Luvai and after discussion with the parties, the court advised them that it would review the docket in civil case 2:14-cv-2544-KJM-DB and determine whether or not lifting the stay would be appropriate. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 6, 2018 Filing 386 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendant Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT.(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
December 6, 2018 Filing 385 PRETRIAL STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff-in-Intervention Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Luvai, Kennedy) (Docket Text Modified on 12/6/2018 by C. Schultz)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 PRE-FILING REVIEW ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/23/18 ORDERING when requesting leave to file a complaint that substantially overlaps with any of the above cases, Mrs. Yeager must (1) attach a copy of this order, and (2) attach a declaration under penalty of perjury averring that the proposed filing is neither frivolous nor made in bad faith. If these requirements are not met, the court may disregard Mrs. Yeager's proposed filing. If Mrs. Yeager complies with these requirements, the clerk shall open the matter as a miscellaneous case to be considered by the general duty judge of this court. The judge will issue necessary orders after determining whether the proposed filing is frivolous or made in bad faith and may also determine whether Mrs. Yeager should be required to furnish security. (Becknal, R)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/23/18 ORDERING in connection with the court's determination that Mrs. Yeager is a Vexatious Litigant, and having carefully considered her objections, the court ADOPTS the pre-filing restrictions as described above and reflected in a separate order being filed concurrently herewith.(Becknal, R)
October 10, 2018 Filing 382 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court requires personal appearance at the Final Pretrial Conference. In light of Ms. Yeager's unavailability for personal appearance on 11/2/2018, the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 12/13/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties' individual pretrial statements are due seven days prior. Ms. Yeager's request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. #381 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry(Schultz, C)
October 8, 2018 Filing 381 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 11/2/2018 Pre-Trial Hearing hearing by Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victoria Yeager)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 10/9/2018 (Reader, L).
October 4, 2018 Filing 380 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Attorney Sarah H. Arnett by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Bond, Brook)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/2/2018 DENYING #128 motion to enforce the settlement agreement and DENYING #364 ex parte request to disburse funds. Parsons Behle's complaint-in-intervention against the Yeagers embodies the sole outstanding dispute in this interpleader action. The matter shall now proceed to trial. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 11/2/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. A pre-trial statement from Mrs. Yeager and a separate statement from Parsons Behle are both due 7 days prior. (York, M)
April 13, 2018 Filing 377 OBJECTIONS by Intervenor Victoria Yeager to #375 Order. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 4/16/2018 (Kaminski, H).
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/2018 GRANTING #340 Motion for Attorney Fees but ADJUSTS the lodestar figure to find reasonable an attorney fee award of $18,765.00, plus $1,151.08 in related legal expenses, and $137.35 in costs. The total sum awarded is therefore $20,053.43 with payment due to the Bowlins by May 4, 2018. (York, M)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/2018 DECLARING Mrs. Yeager a vexatious litigant under the California statute, incorporated in Local Rule 151(b). In connection with this declaration, the court proposes pre-filing review restrictions designed to curb Mrs. Yeager's litigiousness in this court. These restrictions, set forth in the proposed order attached as Exhibit A, will be imposed in a formal order to follow, which may be modified after taking into account Mrs. Yeager's objections. Mrs. Yeager's objections, if any, must be filed within 14 days. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). (York, M)
March 26, 2018 Filing 374 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Don A. Lesser. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lesser, Don) Modified on 3/27/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
January 5, 2018 Filing 373 REPLY by Victoria Yeager to OPPOSITION to #364 Motion for Leave to File Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victoria Yeager)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 1/8/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 4, 2018 Filing 372 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendant Victoria Yeager's Motion/Request for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Distribution of the Interpleader Funds (ECF No. #364 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 1/12/2018 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. The Requests for Telephonic Appearance (ECF Nos. #366 & #371 ) are DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 29, 2017 Filing 371 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 1/12/2017 Motion hearing re #364 Motion for Leave to File Motion filed by Victoria Yeager by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
December 29, 2017 Filing 370 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
December 29, 2017 Filing 369 DECLARATION in opposition to #364 Motion for Leave to File Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noonan, Todd)
December 29, 2017 Filing 368 OPPOSITION by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to #364 Motion for Leave to File Motion. (Noonan, Todd)
December 29, 2017 Filing 367 OPPOSITION by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #364 Motion for Leave to File Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brook B. Bond)(Bond, Brook)
December 28, 2017 Filing 366 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 1/12/2018 Motion hearing re #364 Motion for Leave to File Motion filed by Victoria Yeager by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Bond, Brook)
December 15, 2017 Filing 364 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE MOTION for Partial Distribution of Interpleader Funds by Victoria Yeager. Attorney Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria added. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 12/18/2017 (Benson, A.).
December 14, 2017 Filing 365 COSTS TAXED in amount of $ 101.15 against Victoria Yeager (Benson, A.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 363 USCA MANDATE as to #349 Notice of Appeal filed by Victoria Yeager. This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (Fabillaran, J)
December 7, 2017 Filing 362 WITHDRAWAL of #336 Judgment Lien by Lesser Law Group. (Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 12/8/2017 (Becknal, R).
November 17, 2017 Filing 361 USCA ORDER as to #349 Notice of Appeal filed by Victoria Yeager. This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (Fabillaran, J)
November 9, 2017 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
November 9, 2017 Filing 359 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Cross Defendants Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to #355 Declaration. (Noonan, Todd)
November 9, 2017 Filing 358 REPLY by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to response to #340 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Noonan, Todd) Modified on 11/15/2017 (Zignago, K.).
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/17 ORDERING that the court STRIKES with prejudice Mrs. Yeager's #271 Answer and Cross-Complaint. This resolves Motion to Strike #278 . (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 11/8/2017 (Kastilahn, A).
November 8, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #357 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Kastilahn, A)
November 7, 2017 Filing 356 USCA CASE NUMBER 17-17261 for #349 Notice of Appeal filed by Victoria Yeager. (York, M)
November 3, 2017 Filing 355 DECLARATION of Victoria Yeager in Opposition to #340 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
November 3, 2017 Filing 354 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #340 Motion for Attorney Fees ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. (Attachments: #1 Declaration , #2 Exhibit (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
November 3, 2017 Filing 353 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #288 Motion to Declare Vexatious Litigant (Attachments: #1 Declaration , #2 Exhibit(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
October 31, 2017 Filing 352 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #349 Notice of Appeal filed by Victoria Yeager. Notice of Appeal filed *10/30/2017*, Complaint filed *1/2/2013* and Appealed Order filed *9/29/2017*. Court Reporter: *Babbitt, M*. *Fee Status: Paid on 10/30/2017 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #352 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Victoria Yeager. (Kaminski, H)
October 30, 2017 Filing 351 SUPPLEMENT by Victoria Yeager re #350 Supplement, #349 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Representation and Transcript Order)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 10/31/2017 (Kaminski, H).
October 30, 2017 Filing 350 SUPPLEMENT by Victoria Yeager re #349 Notice of Appeal. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
October 30, 2017 Filing 349 NOTICE of APPEAL by Victoria Yeager as to #338 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-7337587) (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 10/31/2017 (Kaminski, H).
October 19, 2017 Filing 348 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING that Defendant-in-Intervention, Victoria Yeager's, Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time (ECF No. #347 ) is GRANTED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 17, 2017 Filing 347 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Victoria Yeager for EXTENSION of TIME of Deadline to file Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees & Supplemental Brief re Vexatious Litigant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 10/18/2017 (Kaminski, H).
October 13, 2017 Filing 346 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. re #345 Request for Judicial Notice, #343 Brief, #341 Declaration, #342 Bill of Costs Submitted, #340 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES, #344 Declaration,. (Noonan, Todd) Modified on 10/13/2017 (Kaminski, H).
October 13, 2017 Filing 345 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. in re #343 Brief. (Noonan, Todd)
October 13, 2017 Filing 344 DECLARATION of Jacquelyn C. Loyd in support of #343 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Noonan, Todd) Modified on 10/13/2017 (Kaminski, H).
October 13, 2017 Filing 343 BRIEF (Supplemental) Regarding Victoria Yeager Vexatious Litigant Designation by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
October 13, 2017 Filing 342 BILL of COSTS SUBMITTED by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
October 13, 2017 Filing 341 DECLARATION of Todd Noonan in SUPPORT of #340 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Noonan, Todd) Modified on 10/13/2017 (Kaminski, H).
October 13, 2017 Filing 340 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES; MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd) Modified on 10/13/2017 (Kaminski, H).
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/30/2017. The court GRANTS summary judgment for Lesser as to Mrs. Yeagers entire Cross-Complaint. #316 (Andrews, P)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/17 ORDERING the court adjudicates the Bowlins' motions insofar as it: GRANTS the Bowlins' anti-SLAPP motion to strike Mrs. Yeager's entire cross-complaint and therefore DISMISSES the cross-complaint with prejudice. ORDERS the Bowlins to file a brief with supporting declarations identifying the appropriate attorneys' fee award in connection with the anti-SLAPP motion within fourteen calendar days of this order. Mrs. Yeager's opposition is due seven days thereafter, and the Bowlins' reply seven days after the opposition. DENIES as MOOT the Bowlins' motion to dismiss. DENIES as MOOT the Bowlins' request to order Mrs. Yeager to furnish security to maintain her cross-complaint. ORDERS the Bowlins to further brief the question of whether the court should not deny the motion to declare Mrs. Yeager a vexatious litigant and the associated request to issue a pre-filing review sanction against Mrs. Yeager. The Bowlins response to this order is due within fourteen days. Mrs. Yeager's reply, if any, is due seven days thereafter. This resolves ECF Nos. #283 , #284 , and partially resolves ECF No. #288 . The court will resolve the balance of ECF No. #288 once the further briefing ordered here is complete. (Becknal, R)
September 29, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #338 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Becknal, R)
July 7, 2017 Filing 336 NOTICE of Judgment Lien by Lesser Law Group. (Kohls, Daniel)
July 7, 2017 Filing 335 RESPONSE by Victoria Yeager to [ 333 ] Motion Hearing, #334 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victoria Yeager)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 7/10/2017 (Reader, L).
July 6, 2017 Filing 334 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in re #316 Motion for Summary Judgment by Lesser Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33) (Cenat, Dacia)
July 6, 2017 Filing 333 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/6/2017. Attorneys, Daniel Kohls and Dacia Cenat, present on behalf of Cross Defendant Don Lesser dba Lesser Law Group. No appearance on behalf of Intervenor and Cross-Claimant, Victoria Yeager. Ms. Cenat confirmed that the state court trial has concluded with judgment in her client's favor. The court directed Ms. Cenat file, with this court, a copy of the state court judgment. The court and counsel discussed the pending Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. #316 ) and the court took the matter under submission. The court also vacated the current scheduling order. A formal written order will issue. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 28, 2017 Filing 332 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant Lesser Law Group's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. #316 ) set for 6/30/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 7/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 28, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order at ECF No. 332 served on Victoria Yeager. (Schultz, C)
June 23, 2017 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Daniel V. Kohls in SUPPORT OF #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Kohls Decl in Support of MSJ Reply)(Kohls, Daniel)
June 23, 2017 Filing 330 RESPONSE by Lesser Law Group to #324 Opposition to Motion. (Kohls, Daniel)
June 23, 2017 Filing 329 REPLY by Lesser Law Group re #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kohls, Daniel)
June 23, 2017 Filing 328 REPLY by Lesser Law Group to RESPONSE to #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kohls, Daniel)
June 21, 2017 Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1-19-17, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt, E-mail mbabbitt@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Reporter Babbitt or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2017. (Babbitt, M)
June 21, 2017 Filing 326 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #325 by Lesser Law Group for proceedings held on January 19, 2017 before Judge Hon. Kimberly Mueller. Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt. (Kohls, Daniel)
June 21, 2017 Filing 325 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lesser Law Group for proceedings held on January 19, 2017 before Judge Hon. Kimberly Mueller. Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt. (Kohls, Daniel)
June 16, 2017 Filing 324 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Declaration Victoria Yeager)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
June 9, 2017 Filing 323 OPPOSITION by Lesser Law Group to #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kohls, Daniel)
June 8, 2017 Filing 322 AMENDED DECLARATION of Victoria Yeager re #320 Ex Parte Application. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 6/12/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 8, 2017 Filing 321 ADDENDUM to #320 Ex Parte Application by Victoria Yeager for permission to do discovery & continuance of Lesser MSJ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 6/12/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 8, 2017 Filing 320 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Victoria Yeager for Clarification and for Order Removing #316 Motion from Calendar or Continue Hearing for 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 6/12/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 2, 2017 Filing 319 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Lesser Law Group in re #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-19, #2 Exhibits 20-31)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 6/5/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 2, 2017 Filing 318 DECLARATION of Daniel V. Kohls in SUPPORT OF #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 6/5/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 2, 2017 Filing 317 DECLARATION of Don A. Lesser in SUPPORT OF #316 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 6/5/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 2, 2017 Filing 316 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Lesser Law Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Separate Statement)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 6/5/2017 (Zignago, K.).
February 9, 2017 Filing 315 JOINDER in re #270 Answer and Crossclaim by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
February 9, 2017 Filing 314 AMENDED STATUS REPORT by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
January 19, 2017 Filing 313 MINUTES for STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/19/2017. Attorney, Todd Noonan, present for Ed Bowlin, Connie Bowlin, Aviation Autographs, and Bowlin & Associates, Inc. Attorney, Dan Kohls, present for Don Lesser. Pro Se Intervenor, Victoria Yeager, present by telephone. Attorney, Brook Bond, present by telephone on behalf of Parsons, Behle & Latimer. The court and counsel discussed the status of the case. The court directed Ms. Yeager to submit a status report within three weeks confirming Ms. Yeager's expected return date to this district to continue litigation or updating the court as to her availability to return to this district. Court Reporter: Michelle Babbitt. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 18, 2017 Filing 312 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Upon review of the parties' requests for telephonic appearance (ECF Nos. #308 , #310 , #311 ), the court makes an exception to the rule requiring personal presence based on the particulars of the requests. Accordingly, the pending Requests for Telephonic Appearance (ECF Nos. #308 , #310 , #311 ) are GRANTED. Conference call instructions will be emailed to Kennedy Luvai, Brook Bond, Don Lesser, and Victoria Yeager. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 11, 2017 Filing 311 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
January 11, 2017 Filing 310 AMENDED REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 by Lesser Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Lesser, Don)
January 11, 2017 Filing 309 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED FILING AT #310 ) REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 by Lesser Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Lesser, Don) (Docket Text Modified on 1/12/2017 by C. Schultz)
January 11, 2017 Filing 308 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Luvai, Kennedy)
January 11, 2017 Filing 307 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 2:30 PM is ADVANCED on the same date for 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/1/16 ORDERING that Intervener Victoria Yeager is substituted for General Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret.) for all purposes in the above-entitled matter, with the result that she steps into General Yeager's shoes from the date of this order forward. See Summit Canyon Res., LLC v. Barker, No. 215CV2167JADGWF, 2016 WL 740420, at *2 (D. Nev. Feb. 23, 2016) (internal quotation marks, footnotes, and alterations omitted) (quoting In re Bernal, 207 F.3d 595, 598 (9th Cir. 2000)) (substituted defendant bound by substituted-for defendant's prior decision); General Yeager is dismissed without prejudice, but this court retains jurisdiction to withdraw the dismissal should General Yeager's presence in the matter be necessary to protect the rights of General or Mrs. Yeager; The substitution and dismissal ordered above shall not be construed as a waiver of any rights or create an estoppel or impediment to General or Mrs. Yeager's rights, if any, to the interpleaded funds at issue in this matter, or to prosecute or defend any claim to the interpleaded funds. (Becknal, R)
December 2, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #306 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Becknal, R)
October 31, 2016 Filing 305 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the court SUBMITS without a hearing, the following motions: Motion to Substitute (ECF No. #267 ), Motion to Strike (ECF No. #283 ), Motion to Strike Answers (ECF No. #278 ), Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant (ECF No. #288 ), and Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #284 ). If the court determines oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. In the interest of judicial economy, the Status Conference set for 11/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED and RESET for 1/19/2017 at at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Mr. Charles Yeager's pending request for a continuance (ECF No. #303 ) and the pending Requests for Telephonic Appearance (ECF Nos. #292 , #293 ) are DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 28, 2016 Filing 304 RESPONSE by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to #303 Request. (Noonan, Todd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 303 REQUEST for Continuance by Charles E. Yeager. (Houpt, James)
October 28, 2016 Filing 302 REPLY by Parsons Behle & Latimer re #278 MOTION to STRIKE Answers of Intervenor Victoria Yeager or, in the Alternative, to Sever Cross and Counter Claims. (Luvai, Kennedy)
October 27, 2016 Filing 301 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Cross Defendants Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to #295 Opposition to Motion, #296 Opposition to Motion. (Noonan, Todd)
October 27, 2016 Filing 300 REPLY by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to RESPONSE to #283 MOTION to STRIKE. (Noonan, Todd)
October 27, 2016 Filing 299 REPLY by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to RESPONSE to #284 MOTION to DISMISS. (Noonan, Todd)
October 27, 2016 Filing 298 REPLY by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to RESPONSE to #288 MOTION To Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant. (Noonan, Todd)
October 21, 2016 Filing 297 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #288 MOTION To Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 10/21/2016 (Washington, S).
October 20, 2016 Filing 296 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #283 MOTION to STRIKE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 10/26/2016 (Zignago, K.).
October 20, 2016 Filing 295 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #284 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
October 20, 2016 Filing 294 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #278 MOTION to STRIKE Answers of Intervenor Victoria Yeager or, in the Alternative, to Sever Cross and Counter Claims. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
October 19, 2016 Filing 293 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Parsons Behle & Latimer re 291 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing,. (Luvai, Kennedy)
October 19, 2016 Filing 292 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance At Status Conference by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Attorney Lesser, Don A. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lesser, Don)
October 6, 2016 Filing 291 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In the interest of judicial economy and on the court's own motion, the Status Conference and Motion Hearing as to the Motion to Substitute (ECF No. #267 ) set for 10/13/2016 is VACATED and RESET for 11/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The pending requests for telephoinc appearance (ECF Nos. #281 & #282 ) are DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 5, 2016 Filing 290 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Luvai, Kennedy)
October 3, 2016 Filing 289 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
October 3, 2016 Filing 288 MOTION To Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Noonan, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Noonan, Todd) Modified on 10/3/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
October 3, 2016 Filing 287 DECLARATION of Mark A. Serlin in SUPPORT OF #284 MOTION to DISMISS, #283 MOTION to STRIKE and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike. (Noonan, Todd)
October 3, 2016 Filing 286 DECLARATION of Todd M. Noonan in SUPPORT OF #284 MOTION to DISMISS, #283 MOTION to STRIKE and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Noonan, Todd)
October 3, 2016 Filing 285 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. in re #284 Motion to Dismiss, #283 Motion to Strike. (Noonan, Todd)
October 3, 2016 Filing 284 MOTION to DISMISS by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Noonan, Todd)
October 3, 2016 Filing 283 MOTION to STRIKE and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Noonan, Todd)
September 30, 2016 Filing 282 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Parsons Behle & Latimer re #263 Order, #267 Motion for Substitution and Dismissal filed by Charles E. Yeager. (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 10/3/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
September 30, 2016 Filing 281 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance At Status Conference by Lesser Law Group. (Lesser, Don)
September 29, 2016 Filing 280 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Parsons Behle & Latimer re #267 Motion for Substitution and Dismissal. (Luvai, Kennedy)
September 27, 2016 Filing 279 OPPOSITION by Victoria Yeager to #267 Motion for Substitution and Dismissal. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
September 19, 2016 Filing 278 MOTION to STRIKE Answers of Intervenor Victoria Yeager or, in the Alternative, to Sever Cross and Counter Claims by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kennedy K. Luvai, #3 Attachment A, #4 Attachment B, #5 Attachment C)(Luvai, Kennedy)
September 19, 2016 Filing 277 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Lesser Law Group. Attorney Kohls, Daniel added.(Kohls, Daniel)
September 15, 2016 Filing 276 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Claims by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
September 14, 2016 Filing 275 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/12/2014, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2016. Filed by Relief CRD A. Shaddox-Waldrop for ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Shaddox-Waldrop, A)
September 12, 2016 Filing 274 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The proposed attorney substitution filed at ECF No. #272 is GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Todd M. Noonan is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendants and Cross-Defendants Connie Bowlin, individually and as personal representative for the Estate of Ed Bowlein; Aviation Autographs; and Bowlin & Associates, Inc. Attorney Mark A. Serlin is TERMINATED from this action. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 8, 2016 Filing 273 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. for proceedings held on 02/12/2014 before Judge Mag. Kendall Newman. Court Reporter ECRO Jonathan Anderson. (Noonan, Todd)
September 8, 2016 Filing 272 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Noonan, Todd)
August 29, 2016 Filing 271 (STRIKEN per #357 Order) ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM for Legal Malpractice, Professional Negligence, Breach of Fiduciary Duty against Parsons Behle & Latimer by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 8/29/2016 (Becknal, R). Modified on 11/8/2017 (Kastilahn, A).
August 28, 2016 Filing 270 ANSWER with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Lesser Law Group, Ed Bowlin; Connie Bowlin; Aviation Autographs; Bowlin & Associates, Inc by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 8/29/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 27, 2016 Filing 269 RESPONSE by Victoria Yeager to #263 Order,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, Order on Motion to Intervene,,,, #264 Status Report. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria)
August 26, 2016 Filing 268 RESPONSE by Victoria Yeager to #265 Notice #263 Order on Motion to Intervene, #264 Status Report. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 8/29/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 26, 2016 Filing 267 MOTION for Substitution and Dismissal by Charles E. Yeager. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Houpt, James) Modified on 8/29/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 26, 2016 Filing 266 NOTICE in Response to August 12, 2016 Order #263 by Charles E. Yeager. (Houpt, James) Modified on 8/29/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 26, 2016 Filing 265 NOTICE of Position Concerning Status of Evidentiary Record by Parsons Behle & Latimer re #263 . (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 8/29/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 25, 2016 Filing 264 STATUS REPORT by Charles E. Yeager. (Houpt, James)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/12/16 ORDERING Mrs. Yeager's motion is granted to the extent she requests to intervene to represent her joint interests with General Yeager in this case, as memorialized in the assignment of his rights. Within fourteen days, Mrs. Yeager and General Yeager, represented by his guardian ad litem, shall file an appropriate motion and proposed order of substitution or dismissal; In addition, within fourteen days, General Yeager shall file a notice, via his guardian ad litem, briefly explaining whether the General's interests in this case, considered individually or together with Mrs. Yeager, require an expansion of the evidentiary record with re to Parker White's authority, as his former attorney, to enter the purported settlement agreement on his behalf. See generally Order, 11/21/14, #139 . By the same date, any other party may give notice of its position on this same question. A status conference is set for 10/13/16, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3 to set a schedule for the remainder of this case. A joint status report including a proposed schedule shall be filed no later than 10/6/16. (Becknal, R)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd* to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
July 29, 2016 Filing 261 MINUTES (Text Only) of MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/29/2016: Counsel for Intervenor, Kennedy Luvai and Brook Bond present and appearing by telephone. Guardian Ad Litem, James Houpt, present. Proposed Intervenor Victoria Yeager, present. Defendant, Charles Yeager, present. After hearing oral argument, the court SUBMITTED Victoria Yeager's Motion to Intervence (ECF No. #248 ); formal written order to issue. Court Reporter: Kelly O'Halloran and Jonathan Anderson (ECRO) (Shaddox-Waldrop, A)
July 25, 2016 Filing 260 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller GRANTING the request for telephonic appearance filed at ECF No. #258 . Conference call instructions will be emailed to Attorneys Kennedy Luvai and Brook Bond. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/25/16 ORDERING that the court requests that James Houpt, General Yeager's guardian ad litem, attend the hearing on July 29 and be prepared to answer questions about whether General Yeager will challenge the enforceability of the purported assignment in this case and whether recognition of that assignment is in General Yeager's best interests here. (Kastilahn, A)
July 20, 2016 Filing 258 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the hearing on #248 Motion to Intervene set for 7/29/2016 by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 7/20/2016 (Michel, G.).
July 19, 2016 Filing 257 REPLY to #256 Opposition to #248 Motion to Intervene by Victoria Yeager. (Yeager, PRO SE E FILER, Victoria) Modified on 7/20/2016 (Michel, G.).
July 15, 2016 Filing 256 OPPOSITION to #248 Motion to Intervene by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 7/18/2016 (Michel, G.).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/24/2016 GRANTING Victoria Yeager's #247 Motion for leave to file electronically. (Zignago, K.)
June 23, 2016 Filing 254 MINUTES for STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/23/2016. Attorney, James Houpt, present as Guardian Ad Litem for Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret.). Attorney, Don Lesser (via telephone), present for Lesser Law Group. Pro se intervenor, Victoria Yeager, present. Attorney, Kennedy Luvai (via telephone) and Brook Bond, present on behalf of Parsons, Behle & Latimer. The court and counsel discussed the status report filed by Mr. Houpt. The court advised the parties that once Ms. Yeager's Motion to Intervene (ECF No. #247 ) is resolved, the court will discuss further scheduling with the parties. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 20, 2016 Filing 253 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller GRANTING the requests for telephonic appearance filed at ECF Nos. #249 and #250 . Conference call instructions will be emailed to Attorneys Kennedy Luvai, Brook Bond, and Don Lesser. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 17, 2016 Filing 252 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lesser Law Group. (Lesser, Don) Modified on 6/21/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 17, 2016 Filing 251 [PROPOSED] ORDER re #250 , 246 Minute Order, by Lesser Law Group. (Lesser, Don) Modified on 6/21/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 17, 2016 Filing 250 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance at the Status Conference 246 by Lesser Law Group. (Lesser, Don) Modified on 6/21/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 16, 2016 Filing 249 REQUEST TOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Status Conference set for 6/23/2016 by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 6/17/2016 (Michel, G.).
June 13, 2016 Filing 248 MOTION TO INTERVENE by Victoria Yeager. Motion Hearing SET for 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Victoria Yeager, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Michel, G.)
June 13, 2016 Filing 247 MOTION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING by Victoria Yeager. Motion Hearing SET for 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Michel, G.)
June 2, 2016 Filing 246 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy A. Shaddox-Waldrop for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/2/2016: On the court's own motion, a status conference is SET for June 23, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Mueller. The parties and General Yeager's Guardian ad Litem should be prepared to discuss the status report, ECF No. #245 , and how this case may progress in light of the findings and recommendations in that report. (Text Only Entry) (Shaddox-Waldrop, A)
June 2, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: 246 Minute Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Shaddox-Waldrop, A)
June 1, 2016 Filing 245 STATUS REPORT by Charles E. Yeager. (Houpt, James)
April 25, 2016 Filing 244 NOTICE of Change of Affiliation by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/14/2016; The court expects the report by Mr. Houpt to be filed by late May 2016. (Zignago, K.)
April 15, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #243 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Zignago, K.)
March 16, 2016 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION of Request for Payment of guardian ad litem expenses by appointed guardian ad litem James E. Houpt on behalf of Charles E. Yeager, re #241 Order. (Crouch, J)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/22/2016 ORDERING defendant's guardian ad litem's request for authority to incur costs by appointed guardian ad litem James E. Houpt is GRANTED, re #227 Order. (Crouch, J)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/9/16 ORDERING that The Guardian ad Litem shall have authority to move for the sealing or redaction of any documents filed in this case to protect General Yeager's privacy interests. The decision whether to move for sealing or redaction is within the Guardian ad Litem's discretion as an officer of the court. To be clear, the Guardian ad Litem's authority in this respect is limited to the protection of General Yeager's interests not those of Mrs. Yeager or another person, and creates neither an attorney, client relationship nor attorney-client privilege.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 9, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #240 Order, served on Victoria Yeager. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2016 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Parsons Behle & Latimer for proceedings held on September 14, 2015 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Zarian, John)
January 28, 2016 Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 2nd, 2015, Re: Motion Hearing, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Cathie Bodene, Phone number 916-446-6360 E-mail cbodene@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter Cathie Bodene or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (Bodene, C)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/22/16 ORDERING that the court anticipates Mr. Houpt will prepare and file a report as described in the court's previous order within approximately 30 days. (See Order Dec. 28, 2015, No. 13-0007, ECF No. 227.) Upon the filing of his report, any party in Case No. 13-0007 may file objections within 30 days. A further status conference in both Case No. 13-0007 and Case No. 14-2544 will then be set approximately 30 days from the date objections are due. Mr. Houpt is APPOINTED guardian ad litem for General Yeager in Case No. 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-CKD, without objection. That case remains STAYED in its entirety pending further order of this court. The court anticipates Mr. Houpt will not assume an active role in Case No. 14-2544 until his report in Case No. 13-0007 is prepared and addressed as described in this order, although he may consider the posture of the 2014 case and documents filed therein in preparing his report. At the 01/21/16 status conference, Mr. Houpt requested copies of documents discussed in the evidentiary hearing held on 03/24/15. On review of the docket, these documents include both (i) documents admitted and marked as Exhibits A and B in that hearing, (see Exhibit List, ECF No. 167-1); and (ii) documents marked as Exhibits C, D and E, but not admitted at the hearing. By previous order, the court determined the document marked as Exhibit A was not protected by attorney-client privilege with respect to either Case No. 13-0007 or Case No. 14-2544. (See #170 03/31/15 Order). Upon review of the file, the court concludes the same is true of Exhibit B. Exhibits A and B are therefore filed concurrently with this order. As noted, the documents marked as Exhibits C, D and E, were not admitted at the evidentiary hearing, and it is unclear whether General Yeager or Victoria Yeager have waived any privilege that may attach to those documents. Clerk will is directed to forward by e-mail electronic copies of these three documents to General Yeager, Mr. Houpt, Mrs. Yeager, and counsel for Parsons Behle & Latimer upon the filing of this order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Benson, A)
January 25, 2016 Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/14/15, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran, Phone number 916-448-2712 E-mail kohalloran@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 2/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (O'Halloran, K)
January 25, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #237 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Benson, A)
January 21, 2016 Filing 235 MINUTES for STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/21/2016. Guardian ad litem, James Houpt, present for Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret.). Pro se intervenor, Victoria Yeager, present. Attorney, John Zarian, present on behalf of intervenor Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Attorney Don Lesser, present by telephone for Defendant Don A. Lesser, individually and dba The Lesser Law Group. The court, counsel, and parties discussed Mr. Houpt's appointment in case number 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-CKD, the role of the guardian ad litem, and how the case should proceed. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Docket Text Modified on 1/21/2016 by C. Schultz to include Mr. Lesser's appearance.)
January 21, 2016 Filing 234 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller GRANTING Defendant's Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. [233)]; Conference call instructions will be emailed to Attorney Don Lesser. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 21, 2016 Filing 233 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Lesser Law Group re #227 Order. (Lesser, Don) Modified on 1/22/2016 (Reader, L).
January 19, 2016 Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Charles E. Yeager for proceedings held on 9-14-2015 before Judge Mueller. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Houpt, James)
January 19, 2016 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Charles E. Yeager for proceedings held on 6-2-2015 before Judge Mueller. Court Reporter Cathie Bodene. (Houpt, James)
December 30, 2015 Filing 230 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the request at ECF No. #229 and with the understanding that General Yeager's Guardian ad Litem raises no objection, the Status Conference previously set for January 7, 2016 is VACATED and RESET for January 21, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
December 30, 2015 Filing 229 REQUEST TO CONTINUE the Status Conference set for 1/7/2016 by Charles E. Yeager. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 12/31/2015 (Michel, G.).
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/2015 DENYING #225 Ex Parte Application to Seal filed by Charles E. Yeager. (Michel, G.)
December 29, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #228 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Michel, G.)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/2015 APPOINTING James E. Houpt as guardian ad litem for Defendant/Cross Claimant Charles E. Yeager; NOTIFYING all parties that this order may be modified only by the court after notice and an opportunity for any interested party to be heard; SETTING a Status Conference for 1/7/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING the parties to be prepared to discuss the schedule of this case and the possible appointment of Mr. Houpt as guardian ad litem in the related case, no. 2:14-cv-02544 KJM CKD. (Attachments: #1 Resume, #2 Letter)(Michel, G.)
December 28, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #227 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Michel, G.)
December 15, 2015 Filing 226 OBJECTIONS by Intervenor Parsons Behle & Latimer to #225 Ex Parte Application. (Luvai, Kennedy)
December 7, 2015 Filing 225 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal by Charles E. Yeager for To Seal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Application to Seal)(Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles)
November 10, 2015 Filing 224 MEMORANDUM by Kathy L. Smith-Amos, Au.D. provided to the court re 218 9/14/2015 Evidentiary Hearing. (Donati, J)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/10/2015 ORDERING that the appointment of a guardian ad litem is necessary to protect General Yeager's interests in this case. The court will identify a guardian ad litem in a separate order to follow shortly.(Donati, J)
November 10, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #223 Order, served on Victoria Yeager. (Donati, J)
October 2, 2015 Filing 222 RESPONSE by Charles E. Yeager to #221 Order on Motion for Protective Order,. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/2015 DENYING #219 Motion for Protective Order/Request to Seal; GRANTING the Yeagers seven days to: (1) file the assignment in question on the docket or (2) withdraw reliance on said document. (Michel, G.)
September 25, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #221 Order on Motion for Protective Order/Request to Seal served on Victoria Yeager. (Michel, G.)
September 17, 2015 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #219 Motion for Protective Order; Request to Seal. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 9/18/2015 (Michel, G.).
September 17, 2015 Filing 219 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; REQUEST TO SEAL by Charles E. Yeager. Motion Hearing SET for 10/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Victoria Yeager) (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 9/18/2015 (Michel, G.).
September 14, 2015 Filing 218 MINUTES for EVIDENTIARY HEARING held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/14/2015. Attorney, Kennedy Luvai, present by telephone on behalf of intervenor Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Pro se litigant, Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret.), present. Pro se intervenor, Victoria Yeager, present. The court made inquiries of General Yeager, Victoria Yeager, and Colonel Matthew P. Wonnacott, M.D. related to General Yeager's ability to proceed without representation in this case. Ms. Yeager provided the court with two documents. The court directed Ms. Yeager provide the same documents to Mr. Luvai within 48 hours. Ms. Yeager was also granted leave to file a sealing request related to those documents by 9/18/2015. Official Court Reporter: Kelly O'Halloran. Court Reporter, Diane Shepard, present to provide real time option for hearing impaired participant. ADA Coordinator, Yolanda Riley-Portal, present to provide assistance for hearing impaired participant. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 1, 2015 Filing 217 EMAIL sent by Victoria Yeager, dated 8/31/15 at 8:53 PM. (Schultz, C)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/24/15 ORDERING that the hearing set for 8/25/15 at 10:00 a.m. is RESET for 9/14/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Parsons Behle & Latimer may appear at the 9/14/15 hearing by telephone. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 24, 2015 Filing 215 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: For reasons to be outlined in a forthcoming order, the Hearing set for 8/25/2015 is VACATED and RESET for 9/14/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
August 24, 2015 Filing 214 OBJECTIONS / RESPONSE by Charles E. Yeager to Court's #205 Order for Competency Hearing on 8/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support) (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 8/25/2015 (Marciel, M)
August 24, 2015 Filing 213 REPLY by Charles E. Yeager to plaintiff-in-intervention's #210 Request for Partial Closure of Courtroom for 8/25/2015 Hearing and Sealing of Documents. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 8/25/2015 (Marciel, M)
August 24, 2015 Filing 212 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Charles E. Yeager for continuance of 8/25/2015 Hearing or removal from calendar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support) (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 8/25/2015 (Marciel, M)
August 24, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order at ECF No. 215 served on Victoria Yeager. (Schultz, C)
August 24, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #216 Order, served on Victoria Yeager. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 21, 2015 Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller GRANTING Plaintiff-in-Intervention's Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. #206 ). Conference call instructions will be emailed to Attorney Kennedy K. Luvai. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 21, 2015 Filing 210 RESPONSE by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #209 Request for Partial Closure of courtroom at 8/25/2015 Hearing and for Sealing of Documents. (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 8/24/2015 (Marciel, M)
August 20, 2015 Filing 209 REQUEST for Closure of Hearing by Charles E. Yeager re #205 Order. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 8/21/2015 (Kastilahn, A).
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/19/15: #207 Ex Parte Application is DENIED without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
August 20, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #208 Order, served on Victoria Yeager. (Kaminski, H)
August 19, 2015 Filing 207 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Charles E. Yeager for Continuance August 21 deadline and August 25 hearing. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles)
August 18, 2015 Filing 206 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luvai, Kennedy)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/11/15. A hearing is set for 8/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. General Yeager shall appear and be prepared to answer the court's questions regarding competency. Should General Yeager not appear, the court will consider his absence as consent to the appointment of any qualified guardian ad litem without further notice. General Yeager shall submit by email any evidence of his competency for the court's in camera review, without filing it on the docket, by 8/21/15. By the same date General Yeager shall file any requests for partial closure of the 8/25 hearing or the sealing of documents. (Manzer, C)
August 11, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #205 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Manzer, C)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying the Yeagers' #195 Motion for Recusal, signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/21/15. (Kastilahn, A)
July 21, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #204 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Kastilahn, A)
July 17, 2015 Filing 203 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Yeagers' Motion to Recuse (ECF No. #195 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 7/24/2015 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 17, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: 203 Minute Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Schultz, C)
July 10, 2015 Filing 202 OPPOSITION by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. to #195 Motion to Recuse the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller. (Serlin, Mark)
July 10, 2015 Filing 201 RESPONSE by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #195 Motion to Recuse the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller. (Zarian, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE OF LIEN by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Serlin, Mark)
June 15, 2015 Filing 199 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation re: voluntary dismissal at ECF No. #198 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to defendant and cross-defendant De La Pena & McDonald, LLP, sued erroneously as De La Pena & Holiday, LLP. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 11, 2015 Filing 198 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Defendant and Cross Complainant de la Pena & Holiday, LLP by Charles E. Yeager. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 6/12/2015 (Michel, G.).
June 5, 2015 Filing 197 RESPONSE to #194 Declaration of General Charles E. Yeager by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 6/8/2015 (Michel, G.).
June 4, 2015 Filing 196 DECLARATION of Victoria Yeager in support of #195 Motion to Recuse the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2015 (Marciel, M)
June 4, 2015 Filing 195 MOTION to RECUSE the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller by Charles E. Yeager. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2015 (Marciel, M)
June 3, 2015 Filing 194 DECLARATION of General Charles E. Yeager in response to Court's #185 Order regarding consent to Guardian Ad Litems. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2015 (Marciel, M)
June 2, 2015 Filing 193 MINUTES for IN COURT HEARING held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/2/2015. Attorney, Kennedy Luvai, present on behalf of intervenor Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Attorney, Mark Serlin, present for Bowlin parties. Pro se litigant, Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret.), present. Pro se intervenor, Victoria Yeager, present. The court made inquiries of General Yeager related to the appointment of a guardian ad litem. The court granted General Yeager until close of business on 6/3/2015 to file a declaration he partially read into the record at the hearing. Official Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. Court Reporter, Kelly O'Halloran, present to provide real time for hearing impaired participant. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 29, 2015 Filing 192 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation re: voluntary dismissal at ECF No. #187 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), defendant Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C. is is DISMISSED from this action. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 28, 2015 Filing 191 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The ex parte application for an extension of time, ECF No. #186 , is denied. The hearing remains set for June 2, 2015, 2:00 p.m. See ECF No. #185 . (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 28, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: 191 Minute Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Schultz, C)
May 27, 2015 Filing 190 OPPOSITION by Intervenor Parsons Behle & Latimer to #186 MOTION for 43-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to July 15, 2015 re #185 Order,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kennedy K. Luvai, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zarian, John)
May 26, 2015 Filing 189 DECLARATION of P. Andrew Lopez re #187 Stipulation, #188 Proposed Order. (Mendoza, Joanna)
May 26, 2015 Filing 188 PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal re #187 Stipulation by Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C.. (Mendoza, Joanna)
May 26, 2015 Filing 187 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendoza, Joanna)
May 26, 2015 Filing 186 EX PARTE APPLICATION for 43-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to July 15, 2015 re #185 Order by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 5/29/2015 (Manzer, C).
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/21/15 ORDERING: (1) The court sets a hearing for Tuesday, June 2, 2015, 2:00 p.m., at which General Yeager must appear to advise the court whether he will consent to the appointment of a guardian ad litem in this case. (2) If General Yeager consents to the appointment of a guardian ad litem, he shall identify at the hearing the names of two persons who are able to serve as guardian ad litem in this case. General Yeager shall be prepared to explain each proposed guardian ad litem's qualifications and say whether each would consent to fulfilling that role. So that it is clear, given her separate interests, Mrs. Yeager does not qualify to serve as guardian ad litem in this case. (3) If General Yeager does not consent to the appointment of a guardian ad litem, the court at hearing will (a) set a next hearing on the issue of his competence and whether his interests are adequately protected in this action and (b) set a schedule for the in camera submission of evidence related to a determination of his competence. (Becknal, R)
May 21, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #185 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Becknal, R)
May 14, 2015 Filing 184 AMENDED FINAL BRIEF by Victoria Yeager. (Manzer, C)
May 12, 2015 Filing 183 FINAL BRIEF by Victoria Yeager. (Manzer, C)
May 12, 2015 Filing 182 PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERVENTION'S Brief re Necessity of Competency Hearing by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kennedy K. Luvai, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 5/13/2015 (Becknal, R).
May 12, 2015 Filing 181 PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERVENTION'S Closing Brief by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 5/13/2015 (Becknal, R).
May 12, 2015 Filing 180 FINAL BRIEF: Evidentiary Hearing & Request for Judicial Notice by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 5/13/2015 (Becknal, R).
April 29, 2015 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Charles E. Yeager re #167 Evidentiary Hearing held on March 24, 2015 before Judge Honorable Kimberly Mueller, Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 4/30/2015 (Michel, G.).
April 22, 2015 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/24/15, before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett, Phone number 916-442-8420 E-mail reporter.bennett@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2015. (Bennett, K)
April 17, 2015 Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/17/2015: Good cause appearing, the parties' stipulated request for extension of time #175 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadline for the parties' closing briefs re: post-evidentiary hearing and any response to the court's order dated 3/26/2015 is RESET for 5/12/2015. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/16/2015 DENYING #172 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zignago, K.)
April 17, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #176 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Zignago, K.)
April 16, 2015 Filing 175 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Submit Closing Briefs and Respond to Order #169 , by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zarian, John) Modified on 4/17/2015 (Kastilahn, A).
April 16, 2015 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Parsons Behle & Latimer for proceedings held on March 24, 2015 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Zarian, John)
April 8, 2015 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM by Charles E. Yeager in SUPPORT of #172 Motion for Reconsideration. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) Modified on 4/8/2015 (Donati, J).
April 8, 2015 Filing 172 MOTION by Charles E. Yeager for RECONSIDERATION of #170 Order. (Attachments: #1 Motion [Duplicate of Main Doc], #2 Declaration)(Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles) [Document entitled Application to Vacate] Modified on 4/8/2015 (Donati, J).
March 31, 2015 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #167 Minutes for Evidentiary Hearing by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Zarian, John) Modified on 4/1/2015 (Michel, G.).
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/15 GRANTING #168 Motion for Clarification. (Meuleman, A)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/25/2015 DIRECTING the parties to include in the closing briefs ordered following the #167 Evidentiary Hearing, to be filed by 4/21/2015, a response to the court's impression that a hearing on General Yeager's competence is required. (Michel, G.)
March 26, 2015 Filing 168 MOTION for CLARIFICATION by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Declaration of John N. Zarian) (Zarian, John) Modified on 3/30/2015 (Marciel, M)
March 26, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #169 Order served on Victoria Yeager. (Michel, G.)
March 24, 2015 Filing 167 MINUTES for EVIDENTIARY HEARING held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/24/2015. Attorney, John Zarian, present on behalf of intervenor Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Pro se litigant, Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret.), present. Pro se intervenor, Victoria Yeager, present. Witnesses, Brenda Mojarro, Parker White, and Victoria Yeager, were sworn and testified. Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, 9, 10, A and B admitted. The court ordered any closing briefs be filed by 4/21/2015 whereupon the matter will be submitted and a formal order will issue. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (Schultz, C)
March 12, 2015 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT Brenda Mojarro Acceptance of Service of Subpoena by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John)
March 12, 2015 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT Parker White Acceptance of Service of Subpoena by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/3/15 ORDERING that Ms. Yeager's #162 ex parte request to intervene is GRANTED IN PART, subject to the limitations listed in this order. (Kastilahn, A)
February 25, 2015 Filing 163 RESPONSE by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #162 Application. (Zarian, John)
February 23, 2015 Filing 162 EX-PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene by Victoria Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Becknal, R)
February 23, 2015 Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/23/2015: The Ex Parte Application at ECF No. #148 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/24/2015 is VACATED and RESET for 3/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
February 13, 2015 Filing 160 RESPONSE by Charles E. Yeager to #146 Order. (White, R.) Modified on 2/17/2015 (Meuleman, A).
February 11, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE Status Report dated February 11, 2015 by Charles E. Yeager. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/11/15 GRANTING #144 Motion to Enforce Subpoena. The Court therefore ORDERS #144 is GRANTED as to any documents relevant to Mr. White's authority to settle this case; immediately upon receipt, Parson Behle shall serve on General Yeager copies of all documents produced by PWC in response to the subpoena. At any time before the evidentiary hearing, General Yeager may file objections to any documents produced in response to the subpoena. Objections may be based on any of the Federal Rules of Evidence and may include a renewed objection based on attorney-client privilege. General Yeager shall identify and describe the grounds for each objection. This order does not limit General Yeager's ability to object that testimonial evidence presented at the hearing is protected by the attorney-client privilege. (Meuleman, A)
February 9, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE of STATUS REPORT by Charles E. Yeager. (Yeager- PRO SE E-FILER, Charles)
February 5, 2015 Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: As discussed at the pre-evidentiary hearing status conference, General Yeager shall file a notice by close of business tomorrow, February 6, 2015, to advise the court whether a trial will begin on February 17, 2015, in Yeager v. Wild, Carter & Tipton, No. 11-509156 (Cal. Super. Ct. S.F. filed Mar. 14, 2011). (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 5, 2015 Filing 155 MINUTES for STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/5/2014. Attorney, John Zarian, present for plaintiff-in-intervention Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Pro se defendant, Charles Yeager, present. The court and parties discussed the case status. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 4, 2015 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Serlin, Mark)
February 3, 2015 Filing 154 MOTION IN LIMINE by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of defendant in support) (Marciel, M)
February 3, 2015 Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court GRANTS Charles E. Yeager's motion No. #149 to file electronically, understanding his email address to be "editor@chuckyeager.com." The ex parte application for a continuance, No. #148 , is DENIED IN PART as follows: (1) the parties shall appear for the pre-hearing status conference on Thursday, February 5, 2015, at 2:30 p.m., as previously ordered; (2) the motion to continue the deadline for a joint pre-hearing status report is DENIED; and (3) the court DEFERS its ruling on the request for a continuance of the evidentiary hearing pending the pre-hearing status conference. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 3, 2015 SERVICE BY EMAIL: Minute Order 152 served on Charles E. Yeager. (Schultz, C)
February 2, 2015 Filing 151 RESPONSE by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #148 Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John N. Zarian, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Zarian, John)
January 30, 2015 Filing 150 SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to #144 motion to compel by Defendant Charles E. Yeager. (Becknal, R)
January 30, 2015 Filing 149 MOTION to file electronically by Charles E. Yeager. (Becknal, R)
January 30, 2015 Filing 148 EX PARTE APPLICATION for order continuing 2/5/15 and 2/24/15 hearing dates and all related dates by Charles E. Yeager. (Becknal, R)
January 29, 2015 Filing 147 STATUS REPORT by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/15/2015. The hearing on Parsons Behle's #144 Motion to Enforce Subpoena is ADVANCED to 2/5/2015 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM). Any further Motions to Enforce Subpoenas, to Require Production of Documents, for Protective Orders, Motions In Limine, and similar Motions related to Evidentiary Hearing on 2/24/2015, shall be filed no later than Monday, 2/2/2015. Memoranda filed in support of such Motions shall be limited to 10 pages, and each Motion must include a Statement describing parties' efforts to meet and confer to resolve disputes. Responses shall be argued at the pre-hearing status conference on 2/5/2015. The deadline for submission of a joint pre-hearing stipulation and report is RE-SET for Monday, 2/2/2015. (Marciel, M)
January 15, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #146 Order advancing Motion Hearing served on defendant Charles E. Yeager. (Marciel, M)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/13/2015 GRANTING #129 Mr. White's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Donati, J)
January 14, 2015 Filing 144 MOTION to ENFORCE SUBPOENA by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Exhibit A) (Zarian, John) Modified on 1/15/2015 (Marciel, M)
January 14, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #145 Order served on Charles E. Yeager. (Donati, J)
December 22, 2014 Filing 143 OBJECTION to Subpoena to Produce Documents by Charles E. Yeager. (White, R.) Modified on 12/29/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
December 22, 2014 Filing 142 STATUS REPORT by Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin. (Serlin, Mark)
December 10, 2014 Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/10/2014: Good cause appearing, the parties' stipulated request to continue #140 is GRANTED. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines/hearings are VACATED and RESET as follows: the parties shall file a joint pre-hearing stipulation and report by 1/29/2015, a Final Pre-Hearing Status Conference is SET for 2/5/2015 at 2:30 PM, and an Evidentiary Hearing is SET for 2/24/2015 at 10:00 AM. Both hearings will be held in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 9, 2014 Filing 140 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Pre-Evidentiary Hearing and Evidentiary Hearing re #139 Order by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zarian, John) Modified on 12/10/2014 (Kaminski, H).
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/20/2014 DENYING Parson Behle's Motion for Sanctions. It is HEREBY ORDERED that an Evidentiary Hearing is set for 1/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and a final pre-hearing Status Conference set for 1/8/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Joint pre-hearing stipulation and report due 1/5/2015. (Donati, J)
November 17, 2014 Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/17/2014: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Attorney R. Parker White's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #129 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 11/21/2014 is VACATED. The court orders Mr. White to submit, in writing and for in camera review, specific reasons withdrawal is necessary. Counsel shall do so no later than November 24, 2014 at 5pm, and shall serve the same writing on Charles Yeager, who shall likewise submit, in writing for in camera review, any response no later than December 1, 2014. Charles Yeager shall also serve the same response on his counsel. The parties may submit their reasons and response for in camera review by email to kjmorders@caed.uscourts.gov (Text Only Entry) (Streeter, J)
November 7, 2014 Filing 137 OPPOSITION by Charles E. Yeager to #129 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY. (Manzer, C)
November 7, 2014 Filing 136 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2014. Attorney, John Zarian, present for plaintiff-in-intervention Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Attorney, R. Parker White, present for defendant Charles Yeager. The court heard oral argument as to the Intervenor's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, to Disburse Funds, and for Sanctions #128 . The court and counsel discussed availability for an evidentiary hearing, if necessary. A formal written order will issue. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/4/14 ORDERING that 2:14-cv-02544-JAM-CKD is REASSIGNED from District Judge John A. Mendez to to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and from Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney to Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. The Caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:14-cv-2544 KJM DAD. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 4, 2014 Filing 134 RESPONSE by Parsons Behle & Latimer to #129 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY . (Zarian, John)
October 31, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02544-JAM-CKD, 2:07-cv-02517-KJM-DAD by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John)
October 30, 2014 Filing 132 REPLY by Parsons Behle & Latimer to RESPONSE to #128 MOTION for DISBURSEMENT of FUNDS Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Sanctions. (Luvai, Kennedy)
October 24, 2014 Filing 131 STATUS REPORT by Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin. (Serlin, Mark)
October 24, 2014 Filing 130 OPPOSITION by Charles E. Yeager to #128 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Sanctions. . (White, R.) Modified on 10/27/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
October 20, 2014 Filing 129 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Charles E. Yeager. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (White, R.)
October 10, 2014 Filing 128 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Sanctions by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of John N. Zarian, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Proposed Order)(Zarian, John) Modified on 10/15/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 5, 2014 Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/5/2014: Pursuant to the representations of the parties, the court has determined this case has settled. Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 1/5/2015. Accordingly, the Bench Trial set for 9/8/2014 is VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 5, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Parsons Behle & Latimer, Charles E. Yeager. (White, R.)
September 3, 2014 Filing 125 TRIAL EXHIBIT by Charles E. Yeager.(White, R.)
September 2, 2014 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference held on August 22, 2014, before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Phone number 916-446-1347 E-mail kswinhartcsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2014. (Swinhart, K)
August 27, 2014 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Parsons Behle & Latimer for proceedings held on August 22, 2014 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, (Zarian, John)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/25/2014 ORDERING all parties to exchange exhibits as soon as possible; ORDERING all parties to lodge with the Clerk of Court, seven days prior to trial, the sealed original copy of any deposition transcript to be used at trial; ALLOWING Parsons Behle & Latimer to file any motions in limine to resolve any evidentiary issues; CONFIRMING the Bench Trial for 9/8/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; DIRECTING all parties to Judge Mueller's trial schedule outlined at the "important information" link located on her web page on the court's website; ORDERING that trial briefs be filed seven days prior to trial; DIRECTING Lesser Law Group and the Bowlins to file status reports, beginning in sixty days and continuing every sixty days thereafter, notifying the court of the progress of the Bowlins fee application in the Ninth Circuit and the litigation in Sacramento County Superior Court; GRANTING each party five days to file any objections. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Michel, G)
August 25, 2014 Filing 121 TRIAL BRIEF by Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Luvai, Kennedy)
August 25, 2014 Filing 120 WITNESS LIST by Defendant-in-Intervention Charles E. Yeager.(White, R.) Modified on 8/25/2014 (Schultz, C).
August 25, 2014 Filing 119 EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant-in-Intervention Charles E. Yeager.(White, R.) Modified on 8/25/2014 (Schultz, C).
August 22, 2014 Filing 118 AMENDED WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff-in-Intervention Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John) Modified on 8/25/2014 (Schultz, C).
August 22, 2014 Filing 117 MINUTES for FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/22/2014. Attorney, John Zarian, present for Intervenor Parsons, Behle & Latimer. Attorney, R. Parker White, present for defendant Charles Yeager. The court confirmed a half day bench trial on intervenor's complaint #1 . Bench Trial CONFIRMED for 9/8/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/19/2014 DENYING #103 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Donati, J)
August 14, 2014 Filing 115 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendant Charles E. Yeager.(White, R.)
August 13, 2014 Filing 114 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendant Connie Bowlin.(Serlin, Mark)
August 4, 2014 Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/4/2014: On the court's own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2014 is VACATED and RESET for 8/22/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 1, 2014 Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Intervenor's Motion for Summary Judgment #103 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 8/7/2014 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 31, 2014 Filing 111 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED DOCUMENT #118 ) WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff-in-Intervention Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 8/25/2014 (Schultz, C).
July 31, 2014 Filing 110 TRIAL EXHIBIT by Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Luvai, Kennedy)
July 31, 2014 Filing 109 REPLY by Parsons Behle & Latimer re #103 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Luvai, Kennedy)
July 24, 2014 Filing 108 OPPOSITION by Charles E. Yeager to #103 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Response Response to Separate Statement, #2 Declaration)(White, R.)
July 14, 2014 Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/14/2014: On the court's own motion, the hearing as to intervenor's Motion for Summary Judgment #103 set for 8/8/2014 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 8/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Filing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/11/2014 ORDERING attorney Sarah H. Arnett, PHV added for Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zignago, K.)
July 14, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE of Errata re Declaration of John N. Zarian in Support of #103 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John N. Zarian)(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 7/15/2014 (Kaminski, H).
July 12, 2014 Filing 104 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Parsons Behle & Latimer. #103 (Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 7/14/2014 (Reader, L).
July 11, 2014 Filing 103 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of John N. Zarian, #3 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 7/14/2014 (Reader, L).
July 8, 2014 Filing 102 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted for attorney Sarah H. Arnett by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5409932) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 ECF Registration) (Zarian, John) Modified on 7/9/2014 (Marciel, M)
June 25, 2014 Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/25/2014: Good cause appearing, plaintiff-in-intervention Parsons Behle & Latimer, PLC's Ex Parte Application #99 is GRANTED. Accordingly, Parsons Behle & Latimer, PLC's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 7/11/2014 with appropriate briefing to proceed as provided by Local Rules 230 and 260; the motion shall be noticed for hearing on 8/8/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. It is FURTHER ORDERED, that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2014 is VACATED and RESET for 8/14/2014 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/23/2014 ADDING Attorney R. Parker White for Charles E. Yeager; TERMINATING Attorney Michael W. Thomas. (Michel, G)
June 19, 2014 Filing 99 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Parsons Behle & Latimer for Order Shortening Time to File Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kennedy K. Luvai, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kennedy K. Luvai, #3 Proposed Order)(Luvai, Kennedy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 98 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Charles E. Yeager. (White, R.)
June 13, 2014 Filing 97 DEFENDANTS' PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendants Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, and Bowlin & Associates, Inc. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 6/13/2014 (Schultz, C).
June 12, 2014 Filing 96 JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Intervenor Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Luvai, Kennedy) Modified on 6/13/2014 (Schultz, C).
June 10, 2014 Filing 95 ANSWER by Charles E. Yeager. Attorney White, R. Parker added.(White, R.)
May 6, 2014 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re #93 Intervenor Complaint by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John) Modified on 5/7/2014 (Michel, G).
May 5, 2014 Filing 93 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John) Modified on 5/5/2014 (Michel, G).
May 2, 2014 Filing 92 [DISREGARD SEE ECF NO. 93] INTERVENOR COMPLAINT by Parsons Behle & Latimer.(Zarian, John) Modified on 5/5/2014 (Shaddox-Waldrop, A).
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/10/2014. Parsons Behle & Latimer's #72 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Connie Bowlin's #87 Motion to Substitute her in her capacity as Ed Bowlin's personal representative in place of Ed Bowlin is GRANTED. (Marciel, M)
April 3, 2014 Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), defendant's Motion to Substitute Party #87 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 4/11/2014 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 25, 2014 Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motion to Intervene #72 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 3/28/2014 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 21, 2014 Filing 88 REPLY in support of #72 Motion to Intervene by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John) Modified on 3/24/2014 (Michel, G).
March 14, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Death and MOTION to Substitute Party; Declaration of Connie Bowlin. Motion Hearing SET for 4/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/18/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 14, 2014 Filing 86 OPPOSITION by Charles E. Yeager to #72 MOTION to INTERVENE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of General Charles E. Yeager, #2 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael) Modified on 3/18/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 12, 2014 Filing 85 MINUTES for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/12/2014: The following parties, Charles Yeager, Ed Bowlin, Connie Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., and Aviation Autographs, reached a verbal settlement concerning furture proceedings in this action and a possible stay of proceedings in related case Yeager, et al v. Bowlin, et al, 2:08-cv-00102-WBS-CKD. If the above parties comply with the first component of the settlement by the agreed upon date of 2/21/2014, the above parties are to file a stipulation for the stay of the judgment debtor exam and other enforcement proceedings in the related case before Magistrate Judge Delaney by no later than 2/24/2014. Until Magistrate Judge Delaney approves such a stipulation, all dates and requirements in the related case remain in effect. All other dates in this case remain in effect. Defendants Counsel Mark Serlin, Brook Bond, Kennedy Luvai, Michael Thomas, Don Lesser present. ECRO/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
February 5, 2014 Filing 84 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT of Bowlin Defendants by Defendant Connie Bowlin re 75 Minute Order. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 2/6/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 4, 2014 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/4/2014: The request to continue the settlement conference #80 is denied. Defendants Ed Bowlin, Connie Bowlin and Bowlin & Associates, Inc. are granted leave to appear telephonically. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
January 30, 2014 Filing 82 OBJECTIONS by Intervenor Parsons Behle & Latimer to #80 Request. (Luvai, Kennedy)
January 29, 2014 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Connie Bowlin re #80 Request. (Serlin, Mark)
January 29, 2014 Filing 80 REQUEST to Continue Settlement Conference, by Connie Bowlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru C)(Serlin, Mark) Modified on 1/31/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
January 29, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Brook B. Bond on behalf of Parsons Behle & Latimer. Attorney Bond, Brook B. added. (Bond, Brook)
January 21, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John N. Zarian. (Zarian, John) Modified on 1/22/2014 (Michel, G).
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/16/2014 ORDERING attorney Kennedy K. Luvai, PHV added for Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zignago, K.)
January 10, 2014 Filing 76 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Parsons Behle & Latimer for attorney Kennedy K. Luvai to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5125838) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF Registration and Consent to Electronic Service, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Zarian, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/7/2014: On the court's own motion, this matter is referred for a Settlement Conference, to include the proposed plaintiff-in-intervention Parsons Behle & Latimer, SET for 2/12/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven (7) days prior to the settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). In light of the pending settlement conference, the court on its own motion resets the hearing on the pending Motion to Intervene #72 for 3/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
December 5, 2013 Filing 73 REQUEST for for Judicial Notice by Parsons Behle & Latimer re #72 MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Parsons Behle & Latimer. (Zarian, John)
December 5, 2013 Filing 72 MOTION to INTERVENE by Parsons Behle & Latimer. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Attorney Zarian, John N. added. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, #3 Declaration of John N. Zarian, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of John N. Zarian, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C) (Zarian, John) Modified on 4/11/2014 (Marciel, M)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/21/2013 ORDERING that all discovery be completed by 3/20/2014; ORDERING that all dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, be heard no later than 4/25/2014; SETTING the Final Pretrial Conference for 7/11/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that the parties confer and file a joint pretrial conference statement by 6/12/2014; SETTING the Court Trial for 9/8/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that trial briefs be filed by 8/25/2014; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. (Michel, G)
November 14, 2013 Filing 70 MINUTES (Text Only) for STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/14/2013: Defendant Bowlin Counsel, Mark Serlin, present; Defendant Yeager Counsel, Kathleen Staker, present, Defendant Lesser Counsel Don Lesser, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling; order to issue. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Streeter, J)
November 13, 2013 Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/13/2013: Counsel's request to appear telephonically #68 is DENIED for failure to comply with the court's civil standing order. The order, available on the court's website, requires all requests to appear telephonically to be filed five days before the hearing and further requires such requests to state the reasons for which telephonic appearance is necessary.(Streeter, J)
November 13, 2013 Filing 68 PROPOSED ORDER re Request to Appear by Telephone for Status Conference by Charles E. Yeager. (Thomas, Michael)
October 21, 2013 Filing 67 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 10/22/2013 (Michel, G).
October 15, 2013 Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2013: Because the parties have not filed a joint status report as directed by the court's 5/3/2013 Order #55 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/17/2013 is VACATED and RESET for 11/14/2013 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. No later than 11/7/2013, the parties shall file a joint status report. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 7, 2013 Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of AT&T Mobility's deposit into the court's registry of the additional attorney's fees, AT&T Mobility is dismissed as provided by the court's April 16, 2013 order #50 . (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 2, 2013 Filing 64 APPLICATION for Discharge & Dismissal of AT&T Mobility by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Joint Stip Re Discharge & Dismissal of Plaintiff AT&T Mobility from Interpleader Action, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C-Receipt for deposit, #4 Proposed Order on Application for Discharge)(Kohut, Ronald)
October 1, 2013 RECEIPT number #CAE200055538 $7763.63 fbo ATT Mobility LLC by Chartis Specialty Insurance on 10/1/2013. (Manzer, C)
July 25, 2013 Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/25/2013: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #59 is ineffective as it does not comply with FRCivP 41(a)(1)(A) in light of cross defendant De La Pena & Holiday LLP's answer #41 . Plaintiff must file a stipulation of dismissal signed by both parties. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 25, 2013 Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/25/2013: Cross defendants Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, and Bowlin & Associates, Inc. were DISMISSED on 3/25/2013 as provided by plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #39 . Accordingly, cross defendants' Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #31 is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) Modified on 7/26/2013 (Schultz, C).
July 5, 2013 Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendant's Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #31 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 7/12/2013 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 28, 2013 Filing 60 (DISREGARD; DUPLICATIVE OF DOCUMENT AT ECF #59 ) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Notice Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2013 (Schultz, C). Modified on 7/25/2013 (Schultz, C).
June 27, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2013 (Schultz, C).
June 21, 2013 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2013: On the court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #31 set for 6/28/2013 is VACATED and RESET for 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Filing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 13, 2013 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/2013: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #56 is ineffective as it does not comply with FRCivP 41(a)(1)(A) in light of cross defendant De La Pena & Holiday LLP's answer #41 . (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 11, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 55 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 10/17/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Michel, G)
April 30, 2013 Filing 54 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/30/2013: In light of the Related Case Order #53 , the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss Cross-Complaint #31 is RESET for 6/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Briefing shall be governed by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
April 29, 2013 [DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED MINUTE ORDER MINUTE ORDER (ECF 54)] issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/2013: In light of the Related Case Order #53 , the hearing on Plaintiff AT&T Mobility's Motion for Discharge and Attorney's Fees #24 , and Defendants' Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss Cross-Complaint #31 is RESET for 6/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Briefing shall be governed by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) Modified on 4/30/2013 (Schultz, C).
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/24/2013 RELATING this case to 2:07-cv-02517 KJM GGH; REASSINGING this case to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings; ORDERING that the caption on all future documents filed in this case be shown as 2:13-cv-00007 KJM DAD; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G)
April 25, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: #53 Related Case Order served on Charles E. Yeager. (Michel, G)
April 19, 2013 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Charles E. Yeager. (Thomas, Michael)
April 19, 2013 Filing 51 Initial Disclosures by Charles E. Yeager. (Thomas, Michael) Modified on 4/23/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/16/13 DISCHARGING AND DISMISSING Plaintiff AT&T Mobility from Interpleader Action. (Meuleman, A)
April 15, 2013 Filing 49 STATEMENT of Initial Disclosures of de la Pena & Holiday, LLP by Defendant de la Pena & Holiday, LLP. (De La Pena, Gregory)
April 9, 2013 Filing 48 JOINT STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for discharge and dismissal of Plaitniff AT&T Mobility from Interpleader Action by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Kohut, Ronald) Modified on 4/10/2013 (Michel, G).
April 5, 2013 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/5/2013: Pursuant to the Order of Reassignment to District Judge Troy L. Nunley #46 , the Hearing on Plaintiff AT&T Mobility's Motion for Discharge and Attorney's Fees #24 , and Defendants' Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss Cross-Complaint #31 , currently set for 4/22/2013 before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. is VACATED and RESET for 6/20/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. All briefing shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2013 is VACATED. The Court will issue a scheduling order, and if a hearing is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) Modified on 4/5/2013 (Krueger, M).
April 5, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: 47 Minute Order served on Charles E. Yeager. (Krueger, M)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Troy L. Nunley* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Garland E. Burrell, Jr.* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
April 3, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: #46 Order Reassigning Judge, served on Charles E. Yeager. (Donati, J)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER: The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 4/1/13, is rescheduled for 5/13/13, at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/28/13. (Furstenau, S)
March 27, 2013 Filing 44 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Michael)
March 25, 2013 Filing 43 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Lesser Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lesser, Don)
March 25, 2013 Filing 42 ANSWER by Lesser Law Group.(Lesser, Don)
March 25, 2013 Filing 41 de la Pena & McDonald, LLP's ANSWER to CROSSCLAIM of General Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager by de la Pena & Holiday, LLP. Attorney De La Pena, Gregory R. added.(De La Pena, Gregory)
March 25, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael)
March 25, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Charles E. Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael)
March 25, 2013 PARTY UPDATE: Cross Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC is TERMINATED pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #41 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 25, 2013 PARTY UPDATE: Cross-Defendants Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Connie Bowlin and Ed Bowlin TERMINATED pursuan to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #39 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 22, 2013 PARTY UPDATE: Cross Defendant Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C. DISMISSED pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #36 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 22, 2013 Filing 38 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance by Charles E. Yeager. (Thomas, Michael)
March 22, 2013 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Charles E. Yeager re #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Thomas, Michael)
March 22, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Charles E. Yeager. (Thomas, Michael)
March 21, 2013 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE for #31 Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #18 Cross-Complaint, #32 Notice of Motion, #33 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and #34 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Connie Bowlin. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2013 Filing 34 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Connie Bowlin in support of #31 Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #18 Cross-Complaint. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2013 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM of POINTS and AUTHORITIES by Connie Bowlin in support of #31 Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #18 Cross-Complaint. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of #31 Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss #18 Cross-Complaint by cross-defendant Connie Bowlin. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION to STRIKE and/or DISMISS #18 Cross-Complaint by Connie Bowlin. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2013 Filing 30 ANSWER to #18 CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by defendant General Charles E. "Chuck" Yeager (Ret) by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Kohut, Ronald) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2013 Filing 29 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance at 4/1/2013 Pretrial Scheduling Conference by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Request) (Kohut, Ronald) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 18, 2013 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Mendoza, Joanna) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 15, 2013 Filing 27 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Charles E. Yeager for Michael W. Thomas, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomas, Michael) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 15, 2013 Filing 26 [DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - REFER TO #27 SUBSTITUTION AS ORIGINAL] DESIGNATION of COUNSEL for SERVICE. (Thomas, Michael) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 15, 2013 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE for #24 Motion for Discharge from statutory Interpleader and for Attorney's Fees by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Kohut, Ronald) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 15, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION for DISCHARGE from statutory Interpleader and for ATTORNEY'S FEES by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2013 at 9:00 AM before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald J. Kohut in support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order granting Motion) (Kohut, Ronald) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 11, 2013 Filing 23 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Thomas, Michael)
March 8, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:07-cv-02517 by Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C.. (Mendoza, Joanna)
February 28, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by de la Pena & Holiday, LLP. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/1/2013 (Zignago, K.).
February 28, 2013 Filing 20 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by de la Pena & Holiday, LLP. (De La Pena, Gregory)
February 28, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by de la Pena & Holiday, LLP. Attorney De La Pena, Gregory R. added.(De La Pena, Gregory)
February 27, 2013 Filing 18 CROSS COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C., Lesser Law Group, de la Pena & Holiday, LLP by Charles E. Yeager.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 27, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION Allowing Defendant to file electronically by Charles E. Yeager. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 27, 2013 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charles E. Yeager.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 27, 2013 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lesser Law Group. Attorney Lesser, Don A. added.(Lesser, Don)
February 13, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C. served on 1/22/2013, answer due 2/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Case)(Kohut, Ronald)
February 13, 2013 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lesser Law Group served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/19/2013. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action)(Kohut, Ronald)
February 13, 2013 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: de la Pena & Holiday, LLP served on 1/22/2013, answer due 2/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Summons in Civil Action)(Kohut, Ronald)
February 13, 2013 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Charles E. Yeager served on 1/31/2013, answer due 2/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Case)(Kohut, Ronald)
February 12, 2013 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C.. (Mendoza, Joanna)
February 12, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C. (Mendoza, Joanna)
February 12, 2013 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C.. Attorney Mendoza, Joanna Rae added.(Mendoza, Joanna)
January 24, 2013 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc.. Attorney Serlin, Mark A. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Serlin, Mark)
January 3, 2013 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Attorney Hoopis, Laura Kohut added. (Hoopis, Laura)
January 2, 2013 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 4/1/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Michel, G)
January 2, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C., Lesser Law Group, Charles E. Yeager, de la Pena & Holiday, LLP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ronald J. Kohut* *3554 Round Barn Boulevard* *Suite 204* *Costa Mesa, CA 95403*. (Michel, G)
January 2, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants by AT&T Mobiltiy, LLC. Attorney Kohut, Ronald J. ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice Interested Parties) (Kohut, Ronald) Modified on 1/2/2013 (Michel, G).
January 2, 2013 RECEIPT number #CAE200049514 $350.00 fbo AT&T Mobility, LLC by Laura Kohut Hoopis on 1/2/2013. (Michel, G)
January 2, 2013 RECEIPT number #CAE200049517 $308,668.85 fbo AT&T Mobility, LLC by Chartis Specialty Insurance Company on 1/2/2013. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Mobility, LLC v. Yeager, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowlin & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Represented By: Mark A. Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Bowlin
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Represented By: Mark A. Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesser Law Group
Represented By: Don A. Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Yeager
Represented By: James Houpt
Represented By: Michael W. Thomas
Represented By: R. Parker White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C.
Represented By: Joanna Rae Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Autographs
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Represented By: Mark A. Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Bowlin
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Represented By: Mark A. Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: de la Pena & Holiday, LLP
Represented By: Gregory R. De La Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Laura Kohut Hoopis
Represented By: Ronald J. Kohut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Victoria Yeager, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Parsons Behle & Latimer
Represented By: Brook B. Bond
Represented By: John N. Zarian
Represented By: Kennedy K. Luvai, PHV
Represented By: Sarah H. Arnett, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?