September 15, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/12/14 re: 83 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs in connection with this action. The clerk shall administrative CLOSE this file. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
74
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/12/2013 ORDERING Plaintiff SYRCL's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 29 in 2:13CV0059 MCE EFB is DENIED. The federal defendants' Motion For Stay of Proceedings in 2: 13CV0059 MCE EFB is GRANTED. The federal defendants' Motion for Voluntary Remand or Stay of Proceedings 44 in 2:13CV0042 MCE CKD is DENIED with respect to remand but GRANTED with regard to the alternatively requested stay. By 10/22/2013, the C orps shall submit to NMFS the final biological assessment required for NMFS, in turn, to complete a new biological assessment for the Project, by 5/12/2014, NMFS shall issue its final biological opinion for the Project; the stay as to both related ca ses shall be automatically lifted, without further court order, upon issuance of said final biological opinion; Given the stays being ordered by this Court as set forth, the following motions are DENIED as MOOT, without prejudice to being reinitiated if and when the stays are lifted: Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in 2:13CV0059 MCE CKD 64 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in 2:13CV0042 MCE EFB 20 ; and Federal Defendants' Motion for Stay of Summary Judgment Proceedings in 2:13CV0042 MCE CKD 67 . (Reader, L)
|
July 5, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/2/2013 ORDERING plaintiff's 63 Application to file brief in excess of page limit is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 30-page memorandum in support of their Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed with their Application on 6/27/2013 is accepted and deemed filed on that date. Federal defendants may likewise file an opposition brief up to 30-pages. (Waggoner, D)
|
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
62
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/13 ORDERING examination of the above-entitled actions reveals that both actions are related within the meaning of Local Rule 123(a), E.D. Cal. (1997). The actions involve the s ame parties, are based on the same or a similar claim, and involve the same property transaction or event. Because the cases are already assigned to the same district judge, this Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the cases. (Becknal, R)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/5/13 GRANTING 55 Request for counsel to attend by telephone at the hearing scheduled for 6/13/13 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7 on 44 Motion for Volluntary Remand or Stay. The Court will contact the following attorney at his direct phone number 5-10 minutes before the scheduled hearing time: Christopher Keifer, NOAA Office of General Counsel. (Meuleman, A)
|
May 23, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/23/13 GRANTING 27 Motion to Intervene; Nevada Irrigation District is DIRECTED to file its Proposed Complaint (Ex. 1) in Intervention forthwith not later than 10 days following the date of th is Order; GRANTING 31 Motion to Intervene; inasmuch as no proposed complaint has been submitted on behalf of Brophy/Hallwood, any such complaint in intervention MUST be filed not later than 10 days following the date of this Order; GRANTING 36 Motion to Intervene, and its 33 Proposed Complaint MUST also be filed not later than 10 days following the date of this Order; GRANTING 37 Motion to Intervene, and its 38 Proposed Complaint SHALL be filed not later than 10 days following the date of this Order. (Meuleman, A)
|
May 13, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/10/2013 GRANTING Federal Defendants 42 Request for Telephonic Appearance at the Motion Hearing as to 24 , 27 , 31 Motions to Intervene set for 5/16/2013 at 2:00 PM. (Michel, G)
|
March 8, 2013 |
Filing
21
NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/7/2013 ORDERING that the Court DECLINES to relate cases 2:06-cv-2845LKK-JFM, 2:13-cv-00059 MCE-EFB, and 2:13-cv-00042-MCE-CKD. (Zignago, K.)
|