Gentry v. Grounds
Petitioner: Jerry Wayne Gentry
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Case Number: 2:2013cv00142
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/10/15 RECOMMENDING that petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/3/2014 DENYING, without prejudice, petitioner's 27 motion. (Yin, K)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/4/13 DENYING 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Petitioner is granted thirty days from the date of this order in which to file a reply to respondents answer. No further extensions will be granted. (Dillon, M)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/16/2013. Petitioner's 11 Motion to Vacate Judgment is construed as Request for Reconsideration. Upon reconsideration, Magistrate Judge Newman's 2/4/2013 is AFFIRMED. (Marciel, M)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/1/2013 DENYING, without prejudice, petitioner's 2 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Wayne Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Represented By: A. Kay Lauterbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?