Shellabarger et al v. Dicharry et al
Plaintiff: Jeneane Shellabarger and Kenneth Potter
Defendant: Darrin Dicharry, Kevin Hale, Ray Martinez and City of Red Bluff
Case Number: 2:2013cv00188
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 OPINION AFTER BENCH TRIAL CONTAINING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/28/18 ORDERING that Judgment is entered against Plaintiffs on the First Cause of Action; Judgment is entered against Plaintiffs on the Second Cause of Action; Judgment is entered against Plaintiffs on the Third Cause of Action; andThe Clerk of Court shall close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/17. Trial is scheduled for Monday, 11/13/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/28/2017 ORDERING that the Pretrial Conference Statement is now due on 9/5/2017. (Reader, L)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/5/15: Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Darrin Dicharry are dismissed with prejudice and each side is to bear their own costs and fees. (Kaminski, H)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/11/15 DENYING 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER 62 vacating all dates signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/2015. Parties are ordered to file Joint Scheduling Conference Statment within 30 days of resolution of pending Motions. (Marciel, M)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/11/2015 ORDERING 60 Pretrial Conference Reset for 7/16/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Pretrial Conference Statements due by 7/9/2015. (Reader, L)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/5/14 GRANTING 29 Motion to Strike with leave to amend affirmative defenses fifteen, sixteen and seventeen. (Manzer, C)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/5/14: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/20/2014. Discovery due by 9/15/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/12/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/10/2014 GRANTING 17 the parties Joint Motion to Modify the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 3/17/2014; Plaintiffs may serve defendant Darrin Dicharry, Service must be completed by 2/17/2014; Plaintiffs may file the Amended Complaint, which was attached to the Joint Motion as Exhibit A. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/5/13 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP as to Jeneane Shellabarger. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shellabarger et al v. Dicharry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeneane Shellabarger
Represented By: Corey Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Potter
Represented By: Corey Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Dicharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Red Bluff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?