Yeh v. John Doe Warden
Petitioner: Yow Ming Yeh
Respondent: John Doe Warden
Case Number: 2:2013cv00262
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/10/14 recommending that 13 Motion to Dismiss be granted on the ground that the claims raised in this action are not exhausted and the Clerk be directed to close the case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/7/13 ORDERING that Petitioners request for appointment of counsel 16 is DENIED withoutprejudice; and the September 16, 2013 findings and recommendations 15 are VACATED.(Dillon, M)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/16/13 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/14/13 ORDERING that the petitioner shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the 13 MOTION to DISMISS within 21 days. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeh v. John Doe Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yow Ming Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?