Welenco, Inc. v. Corbell, et al.,

Plaintiff: Welenco, Inc. and Water Well Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Gary W. Corbell, Craig G. Corbell, Mark Sharpless and Boredata Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv00287
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/21/16 ORDERING that the complaint and counterclaim are DISMISSED under FRCP 41(a)(1) and (c) with prejudice. All parties will bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
August 25, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/25/15 ORDERING that the Motion for Summary Judgment by Craig Corbell/Boredata 110 is GRANTED as to claims one, two, three, four, and five, in part as to claim eight, and DENIED in all other respects. The Motion for Summary Judgment by Gary Corbel 109 is GRANTED in its entirety. The request to seal is DENIED; Plaintiffs are directed to file the documents (with redacted versions of WEL 1421, WEL 1426, and WEL 1428) from Jarom Phipps' declaration, ECF Nos. 125-3 & 126-3, omitting any personal information of third parties.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 24, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/24/2015 ADOPTING IN FULL 121 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING IN PART 100 Motion for Sanctions and 101 Joinder therein; IMPOSING evidentiary sanctions precluding the plaintiffs from introduci ng into evidence any documents that were not produced by the plaintiffs prior to 2/14/2015 and any testimonial evidence from witnesses John Duffield, Daniel Guardino, Tyler McMillan, or any person designated to testify on behalf of the corporate plai ntiffs Welenco and Water Well; INSTRUCTING the parties to meet and confer regarding the status of the documents, declarations, and testimony that the court may consider in deciding the pending motion for summary judgment; DIRECTING the parties to file a joint statement consistent with the court's instructions provided at hearing within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
March 12, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/12/15 RECOMMENDING that the 100 Motion for Sanctions be granted in part and that evidentiary sanctions be imposed on plaintiffs precluding plaintiffs from introducing i nto evidence, in opposition to the motion for summary judgment or at trial, any documents that were not produced by plaintiffs prior to 2/14/15 and any testimony evidence from witnesses John Duffield, Daniel Guardino, Tyler McMillan, or any person designated to testify onbehalf of the corporate plaintiffs Welenco and Water Well. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
February 27, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs are GRANTED an extension of time to 3/4/15 to file opposition to the motion for sanctions. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 3/6/15. The motion for sanctions remains calendared for hearing on 3/11/15 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 24. (Kastilahn, A)
February 6, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/5/2015. Defendants' 88 89 90 91 92 93 Motions to Compel are GRANTED. No later than 2/13/2015, plaintiffs shall provide full and complete responses, without objection, to defend ants' first set of interrogatories and shall produce responsive documents, without objection, to requests for production of documents, sets one and two, propounded on plaintiffs Welenco, Inc. and Water Well Technology, Inc.. Plaintiffs are cauti oned that failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including monetary sanctons and/or a recommendation that terminating sanctions issue. Defendants' 94 Motion to Strike report and exclude testimony of plaintiff's designated expert Witness John Duffield is GRANTED. (Marciel, M)
January 22, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/22/2015 VACATING the Motion Hearing on 88 , 89 , 90 , 91 , 92 , 93 Motions to Compel, 94 Motion to Strike; ORDERING the parties to meet and confer by 1/30/2015, regarding said p ending motions; ORDERING the parties to file a joint letter brief by 2/4/2015 at 12:00 PM, addressing any unresolved issues raised in the motions; REMINDING the parties that resolution of discovery disputes is available under the informal procedures set forth on Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney's court website. (Michel, G.)
September 12, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/2014. (Marciel, M)
January 14, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 37 Motion to Transfer, signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/13/14. (Kastilahn, A)
September 26, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/13 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 26 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Claims ten and eleven of the first amended complaint are DISMISSED and the motion is DENIED in all other respects. (Manzer, C)
July 24, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/23/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint attached hereto as Exhibit 1 within two (2) court days of the Court's signature of the Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welenco, Inc. v. Corbell, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welenco, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Well Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary W. Corbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig G. Corbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sharpless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boredata Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?