Judd v. Obama et al

Plaintiff: Keith Judd
Defendant: Barack Obama, Deborah Bowen and Democratic Party of California
Case Number: 2:2013cv00537
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/4/15 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. F&R referred to Judge Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
August 25, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/22/14 VACATING 9 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff shall file the documents necessary for service of process, as set forth in 3 , with the United States Marshal on or before 9/19/14. (Meuleman, A)
July 1, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/1/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due withing 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
May 23, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/22/13 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Service is appropriate for defendants President Barack Obama, Debra Bowen, and Democratic Party of California. Plaintiff is directed to submit service documents to the USM and a statement with the court that documents have been submitted within 21 days. The USM shall serve process within 90 days. (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judd v. Obama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic Party of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?