Gray v. Cash
Petitioner: Mark Wayne Gray
Respondent: Brenda M. Cash
Case Number: 2:2013cv00564
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/21/18 DENYING 59 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, and petitioner is hereby informed that he may file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (cc: USCA, 9th circuit) (Plummer, M)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/13/2017 VACATING the 12/20/2016 37 findings and recommendations and RECOMMENDING petitioner's 1 application for a writ of habeas corpus be granted on p etitioner's claim that the evidence is insufficient to support the jury's true finding on the enhancement allegation under Cal. Penal Code § 12022.75. The petition should be denied in all other respects. Subject to the following exce ption, proceedings in state court leading to retrial on the enhancement allegation should be commenced within 60 days from any order adopting this recommendation. However, if either party appeals the judgment in this case, no criminal proceedings s hould be required to commence until 60 days after the issuance of the mandate following a final appellate decision or the denial of a petition for writ of certiorari, whichever occurs later. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/19/16 RECOMMENDING that petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus be granted on petitioners claim that the evidence is insufficient to support the jurys true fi nding on the enhancement allegation under Cal. PenalCode § 12022.75. The petition should be denied in all other respects. If adopted, subject to the following exception, proceedings in state court leading to retrial on the enhancement allegation shall be commenced within 60 days. However, if either party appeals the judgment in this case, no criminal proceedings need be commenced until 60 days after the issuance of the mandate following a final appellate decision or the denial of a petition for writ of certiorari, whichever occurs later. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/1/2014 GRANTING respondent's 29 motion to file a surreply; respondent's surreply to petitioner's traverse is deemed filed. (Yin, K)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/6/2014 GRANTING 24 Motion for 13-Day Extension of Time; ORDERING the petitioner to file his Traverse with points and authorities by 12/31/2013. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Wayne Gray
Represented By: Charles R Khoury, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brenda M. Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?