Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Placer ARC

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Placer ARC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00577
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2016 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/9/16 ORDERING that ARC's motion for attorneys' fees is DENIED. ARC's costs of $19,696.25 are taxed to the EEOC. This order resolves ECF Nos. 202 and 204 . (Becknal, R)
January 7, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/6/16 ORDERING the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) brought this action in the public interest to seek relief from Placer ARC (ARC) on behalf of charging party Homeyra Kazerounian. S ee generally Compl., ECF No. 1 . The EEOC pursued claims of discrimination under the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 (ADA). During trial, which concluded with a verdict in ARC's favor on December 17, 2015, the court ruled on numerous EEOC objections to evidence. This order explains the court's bench ruling on December 10, 2015, overruling the EEOC's objections to admissions of Ms. Kazerounian's out-of-court statements.(Becknal, R)
December 18, 2015 195 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/15. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 1, 2015 171 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/1/2015. (Reader, L)
November 25, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/24/2015 DENYING 100 Motion in Limine No. 2; DENYING 105 Motion in Limine No. 7. (Michel, G.)
July 13, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/10/2015 GRANTING Defendant's 67 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's retaliation claims and DENYING Defendant's 67 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's disability and constructive discharge claims. Final Pretrial Conference is CONFIRMED for 9/3/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 8/20/2015. (Donati, J)
December 15, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/15/2014 re: non-disclosure agreement to govern production of expert witness's testing materials and protocols. (Donati, J)
July 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/21/14: Ms. Kazerounian shall be given additional time through August 15, 2014 to review and identify any changes that may be needed to correct her deposition testimony of June 13, 2014. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Placer ARC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: David Forgan Offen-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer ARC
Represented By: Robert Louis Rediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?