Fisher v. Cappel et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Fisher
Defendant: R. Cappel, D. Rosario and G. Swrathout
Case Number: 2:2013cv00642
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/21/15 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/15/15 ordering that within 21 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/11/13. Defendants Swarthout and Rosario are DISMISSED from this action; plaintiff's claims for retaliation are DISMISSED. (Manzer, C)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/09/13 ORDERING the clerk of the court make a random assignment of a district judge to this case. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that that for the reasons explained in the order filed on 06/20/13 9 : 1) defendants Swarthout and Rosario be dismissed from this action and 2) plaintiff's claims of retaliation be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/19/13 ORDERING that 8 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Plaintiffs claims of retaliation against all d efendants, and his Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Swarthout and Rosario, are dismissed for the reasons discussed above. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this Order.(Dillon, M)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/03/13 ordering plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall send to plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Cappel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Swrathout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?