Fisher v. Cappel et al
Plaintiff: |
Kevin Fisher |
Defendant: |
R. Cappel, D. Rosario and G. Swrathout |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00642 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Solano |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
28
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/21/15 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/15/15 ordering that within 21 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
|
September 12, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/11/13. Defendants Swarthout and Rosario are DISMISSED from this action; plaintiff's claims for retaliation are DISMISSED. (Manzer, C)
|
August 9, 2013 |
Filing
14
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/09/13 ORDERING the clerk of the court make a random assignment of a district judge to this case. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that that for the reasons explained in the order filed on 06/20/13 9 : 1) defendants Swarthout and Rosario be dismissed from this action and 2) plaintiff's claims of retaliation be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/19/13 ORDERING that 8 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Plaintiffs claims of retaliation against all d efendants, and his Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Swarthout and Rosario, are dismissed for the reasons discussed above. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this Order.(Dillon, M)
|
April 4, 2013 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/03/13 ordering plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall send to plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?