Hoang et al v. Vinh Phat Supermarket et al
Plaintiff: Ye-Gui Bu, Yun WU, Danny Hung Leung, Jeanette Hoang, Guang Gu Xiang, Mengting Fanny Kuo, Gia Nham Thanh, Edmond Cau Van, Gao Zhi Wei and Cooc Man Coong
Defendant: Vinh Phat Supermarket, Sau V. Vong, Cam Ly and Suying Plaskett
Case Number: 2:2013cv00724
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER 50 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/30/14 ORDERING this case DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER 45 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/17/2014 extending Third-Party Defendant Muoi Lam's time to respond to the Third-Party Complaint filed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Suying Plaskett, Sau Vong, and Chan Cam Ly until 2/18/2014. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/19/13. The Court EXTENDS Third-Party Defendant Muoi Lam'S time to respond to the Third-Party Complaint filed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Suying Plaskett, Sau Vong, and Chan Cam Ly on 8/26/13 31 until thirty (30) calendar days after mediation between the parties to this suit has concluded. If mediation does not conclude on12/17/13, Third-Party Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiffs shall inform the Court that mediation was not concluded and advise the Court when mediation will be concluded.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/24/13: Discovery due by 10/30/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/13/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 27 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/12/2013 resetting the Scheduling Conference for 9/30/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 9/16/2013. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/24/13 CONTINUING Scheduling Conference to 9/3/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Joint status report due by 8/20/13. (Manzer, C)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/3/13 GRANTING leave to amend Plaintiffs; First Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to 11 Amended Stipulation shall be deemed filed and served as of 5/15/13, and defendant's time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint shall run from that date. The 5/20/13 hearing date on defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED, and the motion is now MOOT. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoang et al v. Vinh Phat Supermarket et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ye-Gui Bu
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yun WU
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Hung Leung
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Hoang
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guang Gu Xiang
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mengting Fanny Kuo
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gia Nham Thanh
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond Cau Van
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gao Zhi Wei
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooc Man Coong
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinh Phat Supermarket
Represented By: Katie Konz
Represented By: Cassandra M Ferrannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sau V. Vong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cam Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suying Plaskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?