St. Clair v. Schlachter

Plaintiff: Jimmy R. St. Clair
Defendant: Stan Schlachter
Case Number: 2:2013cv00804
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/13/16 ordering defendant's request to seal 81 is granted. The following documents are deemed sealed: a. Exhibit E to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2; b. Exhibit G to Defendants Motio n in Limine No. 2; and c. Exhibit H to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2. The sealed documents are Bate-Stamped Nos. AGO0000001 to AGO0000028,AGO0000275 to AGO0000280, and AGO0000486 to AGO0000495. In addition, the time limitation associated with thi s Order shall be consistent with the time limitations expressed in the Court Order dated June 8, 2016. Persons to be permitted access to the documents include the parties to the action, their counsel, this Court, and this Courts personnel as needed.(Plummer, M) Modified on 7/13/2016 (Plummer, M).
June 8, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/07/16 regarding confidential material. (See order for further details)(Plummer, M)
May 23, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 65 ex parte application. Within seven days, plaintiff and PTBC shall meet-and-confer regarding the scope of the subpoena and submit to the court a mutually-drafted protective order. All documents responsive to the subpoena, limited by relevance and privacy concerns, and subject to the protective order, shall be produced to plaintiff within ten days from the date of this Order. (Yin, K)
May 18, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/18/16 ORDERING pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation to Allow Limited Discovery Beyond the 5/15/16 discovery deadline, ECF No. 69 , the court GRANTS the parties' request to conduct the depositions of Dr. Victoria Pickering and Linda Strickland beyond the 5/15/16 discovery deadline, nunc pro tunc. The depositions shall be conducted as soon as practicable without requiring any other change in the schedule of the case. (Becknal, R)
April 5, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/4/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff Jimmy St. Clair's 62 ex parte application for an extension of the discovery deadline is GRANTED IN PART. The discovery cut-off is EXTENDED to 5/15/2016. All other dates remain in place, as does the balance of this court's 54 Order of 10/20/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
March 4, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/3/2016 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 4/15/2016; ORDERING that all other dates remain in place. (Michel, G.)
February 11, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/11/16 ordering pursuant to the parties stipulation, and FRCP 30(a)(2), the court grants the parties leave to depose plaintiff Jimmy St. Clair and inmates Shane Beaudoin and Harry Olivares. (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/5/2015. Attorneys Matthew Vanis Edward B. Gaus are ADDED for plaintiffJimmy R. St. Clair. Appointed counsel shall notify Sujean Park at (916) 930-4878, or via e-mail at spark@caed .uscourts.gov if they have any questions related to appointment. Clerk directed to serve a copy of Order on Mr. Vanis and Mr. Gaus at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP. Status Conference has been SET before Judge Mueller on 6/25/2015 at 2:30 PM. By 7 days before Status Conference, parties may file a new Joint Statement providing undate on any information contained in 4/27/2015 39 Statement. [cc: plaintiff Jimmy R. St. Clair and Sujean Park / ADR Coordinator] (Marciel, M)
May 19, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/18/15 ORDERING as follows: (1) Having reviewed the parties' joint statement and in partial reconsideration of its order issued March 30, 2015, the court has determined that plaintiff's claims and the status of the case warrant appointment of counsel. The court refers this case to the court's ADR and Pro Bono Coordinator, Sujean Park, for identification of counsel to represent plaintiff and appear at the status conference set below . (2) The case is set for status before the undersigned on June 25, 2015, at 2:30 p.m. By seven days before the status conference, the parties may file a new joint statement providing an update on any of the information contained in the statement filed April 27, 2015. (Becknal, R)
March 30, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/15. Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint statement within 30 days. (Manzer, C)
January 6, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/2015 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 27 motion for partial summary judgment be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 11, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jimmy R. St. Clair signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/10/2014. CDCR is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair v. Schlachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy R. St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Schlachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?