March 24, 2015 |
Filing
41
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/23/15 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice to plaintiff pursuing his claims herein in his first-filed action. Springfield v. Singh, Case No. 2:12-cv-2552 KJM AC P. Defendants' motion to dismiss 32 and motion to strike 40 be denied as moot. Motions 32 and 40 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
August 14, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/13/2014 DENYING the 22 motion to consolidate cases, without prejudice to its renewal upon adjudication of the motions at ECF Nos. 51 and 54 in Case No. 2:12-cv-2552; defendants Allen, Singh and Arnold in Case No. 2:13-cv-0809 must file their response to the 5/8/2013 complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/12/14 ORDERING that Defendants motion for a protective order, ECF No. 65 in No. 2:12-cv-2552 KJM AC P, seeking a stay of discovery pending resolution of the motion for summary judgment on groun ds of a failure to exhaust administrative remedies and the motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted; and, Defendants motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs request for production of documents, ECF No. 69 in Case No. 2:12-cv-2552, is denied as moot.(Dillon, M)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing
26
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/14 ORDERING that that the action denominated as No. 2:13-cv-0809 KJN P is reassigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as No. 2:13-cv-0809 KJM AC P and any and all dates currently set before the Honorable Kendall J. Newman only are hereby vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/17/13 GRANTING 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants are granted an additional 30 days, to and including October 16, 2013, within which to file a responsive pleading to the complaint in this action.(Dillon, M)
|
July 29, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/26/2013 ORDERING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
|
May 23, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/22/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Clerk of the Court shall separate pages 3 to 15 from plaintiffs May 13, 2013 filing 7 and docket the signed, original complaint (ECF No. 7:3-15) as a separate docket entry, filed May 8, 2013. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: K. Allen, V. Singh, and E. Arnold. Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff three USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed May 8, 2013.(Dillon, M)
|
May 2, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ciron B. Springfield signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/1/2013. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
|