United States of America v. Approximately $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: |
United States of America |
Defendant: |
Approximately $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency |
Claimant: |
Gerard Richard |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00858 |
Filed: |
May 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Drug Related Seizure of Property |
Cause of Action: |
21 U.S.C. § 881 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
32
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/12/14. The Court ADOPTS the Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture entered into by and between the parties to this action. Judgment is entered against claimant Gerard Richard and all other potential claimants who have not filed claims in this action. Upon entry of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture, $18,900.00 of the $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency, together with any interest that may have accrued on the total amoun t seized, shall be forfeited to the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 881(a)(6), to be disposed of according to law. Upon entry of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture, but no later than 60 days thereafter, $7,000.00 of the $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency shall be returned to claimant Gerard Richard. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 27, 2014 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/2014 DENYING claimant Gerard Richard's 25 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Claimant may file a Proposed Schedule for action within 14 days of date of Order if he desires to do so. (Marciel, M)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/25/2013 DENYING without prejudice 9 Motion for Extension of Time; DENYING without prejudice 14 Motion for Acceptance of previously submitted claim; ORDERING Claimant Richard to file and serve a proper verified claim within thirty (30) days; ORDERING Claimant Richard to file and serve an answer to the 1 Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem twenty-one (21) days thereafter; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a proposed schedule for this action fourteen (14) days thereafter; ALLOWING Claimant Richard to file a proposed schedule fourteen (14) days thereafter. (Michel, G)
|
August 22, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/21/13 ORDERING that a Status Conference is set for 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Manzer, C)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/7/2013 GRANTING 1 Application for Publication filed by United States of America. (Reader, L)
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
3
ORDER re issuance of warrant for arrest of articles in rem signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/13. (Kaminski, H)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?