Jewett v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Plaintiff: Everett Jewett
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Shasta County Jail and Austin
Case Number: 2:2013cv00882
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/22/2019. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/29/18 APPROVING the parties' settlement regarding attorneys' fees and expenses, finding that an award of $850,000.00 is to be paid by 1/31/2019 to plaintiffs' counsel. (Kastilahn, A)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/23/2018 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Everett Jewett via telephonic conferencing at 9:00 a.m. on 12/5/2018 before the Honorable Kendall J. New man at the California Medical Facility. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. The court will contact CMF with the call-in number and instructions. (cc: KJN) 3 Certified copies served on The Warden, California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2000, Vacaville, CA 95696-2237. (Henshaw, R)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/6/2018. (Zignago, K.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/17/18 GRANTING 157 Motion to conduct settlement conference. (Kaminski, H)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/20/2018 GRANTING the Preliminary Approval of Settlement; GRANTING Certification of Settlement Class; DIRECTING Notice to the Class; Fairness Hearing is SET for 6/28/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Washington, S)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/27/2018 EXTENDING the briefing deadlines. Plaintiff shall submit the Rule 37(e) motion on 2/21/2018; Defendant Shasta County shall submit its Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 37(e) motion on 3/14/2018; Plaintiff shall submit his Reply to the Rule 37(e) motion on 3/21/2018; and, the noticed hearing on this matter will be heard on 3/28/2018.(Yin, K)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/18 ORDERING the present discovery cut-off and deadlines for filing of dispositive motions contained in the May 25, 2017 order 110 are VACATED. Fact discovery shall be completed by July 31, 20 18. Motions to compel must be heard no later than July 13, 2018. Initial expert disclosures shall be made on or before August 28, 2018, and rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made on or before September 17, 2018. All pretrial motions, except motion s to compel discovery, shall be completed on or before October 29, 2018. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness no later than 30 days after receiving the courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the part ies do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file aJoint Notice of Trial Readiness no later than 30 days after the close of discovery, and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. After review of the parties Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the court will issue an order that sets forth dates for a final pretrial conference and trial. (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/23/2018 (Plummer, M).
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/25/17 ordering The present discovery cut-off and deadlines for filing of dispositive motions contained in the February 3, 2017 Order are vacated. Fact discovery shall be completed by March 30, 2018. Motions to compel must be heard not later than March 16, 2018. Initial expert disclosures shall be made on or before April 30, 2018; rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made on or before May 18, 2018. All pretrial motions, excep t motions to compel discovery, shall be completed on or before June 30, 2018. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty days after receiving the Courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). I f the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty days after the close of discovery and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. After review of the parties Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth dates for a final pretrial conference and trial. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/25/2017 (Plummer, M).
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/27/2017 EXCUSING plaintiffs Ackley and Everett from appearing at the settlement conference scheduled for 5/18/2017 at 9:00 AM. (Henshaw, R)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/4/2017 ADOPTING IN FULL 90 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 83 Motion to Certify Class; DEFINING the certified class; APPOINTING Keker & Van Nest LLP, Disability Rights Legal Center, and Atabek & Associates, P.C. as class counsel. (Michel, G.)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER and AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/13/17 vacating 89 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for class certification 83 be granted. The following class be certified pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: All current and future detainees and prisoners at Shasta County Jail with mobility disabilities who, because of their disabilities, need appropriate accommodations, modifications,services, and and/or physical access in accordance with federal and state disability laws. Keker & Van Nest LLP, Disability Rights Legal Center, and Atabek & Associates,P.C. be appointed class counsel. MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS 83 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 7 days.(Plummer, M) Modified on 3/13/2017 (Plummer, M).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/08/17 recommending that plaintiffs motion for class certification 83 be granted. The following class be certified pursuant to Rule 23(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: All current and future detainees and prisoners at Shasta County Jail with mobility disabilities who, because of their disabilities, need appropriate accommodations, modifications ,services, and and/or physical access in accordance with fed eral and state disability laws. Keker & Van Nest LLP, Disability Rights Legal Center, and Atabek & Associates,P.C. be appointed class counsel. Motion 83 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 7 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/9/2017 (Plummer, M).
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/02/17 ordering the present discovery cut-off and deadlines for filing of dispositive motions contained in the October 20, 2016 order are vacated. Fact discovery shall be completed by November 1, 2017. Motions to compel must be heard not later than October 10, 2017. Initial expert disclosures shall be made on or before January 10, 2018; rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made on or before February 1, 2018. The parties are or dered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty(30) days after receiving the Courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a J oint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of discovery and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. After review of the parties Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth dates for a final pretrial conference and trial. (Plummer, M) Modified on 2/3/2017 (Plummer, M).
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/22/16 ordering Dr. Jeremy Austin, Mary Barns, and James Roemech are dismissed as defendants in this action. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: Shasta County and Tom Bosenko,Sher iff of Shasta County. Within fourteen days of the date of this order, counsel for defendant Shasta County Sheriffs Department, Mr. Gary Brickwood, is directed to file waivers of service ofprocess for new defendants Shasta County and Tom Bosenko, or show cause inwriting why he is unable to do so. All defendants shall have thirty days from the date of service of the fifth amended complaint, or the filing of waivers of service thereto, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Within sixt y days of the filing date of this order, the parties shall file a joint statement of availability for the period of September 1, 2016 through November 30, 2016, indicating blackout dates when counsel will not be available for a status conference.(Plummer, M) Modified on 6/23/2016 (Plummer, M).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/1/16, ORDERING that the Court grants leave for Plaintiff to file a Fifth Amended Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/16/2016 ORDERING that the deadline to file plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 5/30/2016. (Reader, L)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/15/16 ordering that the discovery cut-off of 03/15/16 and the dispositive motion deadline of 06/15/16 are vacated. Plaintiff will file or seek leave to file, Plaintiff's amended complaint within 60 days of this order. (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/08/16. (See order for further details).(Plummer, M)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/18/15 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 43 motion to compel. (Yin, K)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/28/15 ordering that the discovery deadline of 09/09/15 and the dispositive motion deadline of 12/02/15 are vacated. The Discovery and Scheduling Order 30 is hereby revised as follows: The parties may conduct discovery until 03/15/16. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 6/15/16. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/4/2015 GRANTING defendant's 40 motion and VACATING the 4/1/2015 hearing; the Scheduling Order is revised as to discovery is extended to 9/9/2015, and all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 12/2/2015. (Yin, K)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/21/14 ordering plaintiff's claims of negligence and due process violations against the defendants are dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file a third amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this order. Plaintiff's premature motion for summary judgment 10 is hereby vacated. (Plummer, M)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Everett Jewett signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/26/13. The Sheriff of Shasta County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this orderand a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Shasta County. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewett v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Jewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?