H. et al v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: A.H. and Timothy Hill
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Critigen LLC Comprehensive Health and Welfare Benefits Program and Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00895
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/7/16. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to Plaintiffs A.H., a minor by an through her Guardian Ad Litem, Timothy Hill and Timo thy Hill and Defendants Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, and Critigen LLC Comprehensive Health and Welfare Benefits Program. The Clerk is directed to send copies of this Order to all counsel of record. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 18, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 11 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/13 ORDERING that Defendants may have an additional week's extension to and including July 24, 2013, to respond to the Complaint filed in this action. (Kastilahn, A)
May 29, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/28/13 ORDERING the petition for an order appointing TIMOTHY HILL as guardian ad litem for the petitioner is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. et al v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.H.
Represented By: Amanda S. Uhrhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hill
Represented By: Amanda S. Uhrhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critigen LLC Comprehensive Health and Welfare Benefits Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?