Expression Systems, LLC., v. UMN Pharma, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Expression Systems, LLC
Defendant: Johnathan Drutz, Kengo Uemura and UMN Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00965
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting without leave to amend 25 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/25/14. (Kaminski, H)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss and granting with prejudice Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/22/14. (Kaminski, H)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/22/13 ORDERING that Defendant Jonathan Drutz shall have an extension of time to 8/15/2013 to serve and file his Answer to the Complaint or a Motion under FRCP 12(b). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expression Systems, LLC., v. UMN Pharma, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Drutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kengo Uemura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMN Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expression Systems, LLC
Represented By: Miles C. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?