Ruppel v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Char Ruppel
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2013cv01199
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/16/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Waggoner, D)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/19/13 ORDERING that a dispositional document shall be filed no later than 12/10/13. (Manzer, C)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/18/2013 ORDERING that the current Status Conference scheduled for 9/30/2013 at 9:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to 11/4/2013 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr., and that all corresponding deadlines are EXTENDED accordingly. A Joint Status Report shall be filed fourteen days before the hearing. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruppel v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Kristina Marie Launey
Represented By: Sophia Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Char Ruppel
Represented By: Sheri Lynn Leonard
Represented By: Robert Peter Henk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?