Adamov v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Plaintiff: Yury Adamov
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Case Number: 2:2013cv01222
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/28/19 DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (ECF No. 95 ) (Becknal, R)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2018 GRANTING 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. The 87 Request for Reconsideration is DENIED as moot. (Zignago, K.)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018 ORDERING the deadline for class certification discovery is EXTENDED until 90 days after the Court's decision on the later-decided of PwC's Motion for Summary Judgme nt and PwC's Motion for Reconsideration. The deadline for class-related expert witness designation is EXTENDED until 14 days after the class certification discovery cutoff. The deadline to file a motion for class certification is EXTENDED to 28 days after the deadline for class-related expert witness designation. (Zignago, K.)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/28/18: The deadline for class certification discovery is extended to June 1, 2018. The deadline for class-related expert witness designation is extended to June 15, 2018. The deadline to file a motion for class certification is extended to July 13, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/2018 ORDERING that: Any Request for Reconsideration shall be filed on or before 1/19/2018; The opposition to any Request for Reconsideration shall be filed on or before 2/2/2018; The deadline for class certification discovery is EXTENDED to 3/5/2018; The deadline for class-related expert witness designation is EXTENDED to 3/19/2018; and The deadline to file a motion for class certification is EXTENDED to 4/23/2018. (Hunt, G)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/21/17. GRANTING and DENYING plaintiff's 75 Motion for Discovery as follows: The motion is GRANTED with respect to RFP Nos. 1, 3-9, 17, 32, AND 37; and the motion is DENIED with respect to RFP Nos. 27, 36, 50-51, 55, 57, 58, 62 and 74. (Benson, A.)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/27/2017 ORDERING that Phase I class certification discovery shall be COMPLETED by 1/19/2018. All other dates currently set forth in this Courts 10/4/2017 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order as set forth above, shall remain in full force and effect. (Hunt, G)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/21/2017 ORDERING 64 that the motion hearing date of 11/22/2017, at 10:00 AM is VACATED. (Reader, L)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/17/17 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Defendant to produce documents responsive to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set One, presently set for 10/25/17 64 shall be CONTINUED to Wednesday 11/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2017 EXTENDING Discovery and Class Certification Deadlines. Phase I class certification discovery due by 12/7/2017. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification shall be filed by 3/9/2018. (Donati, J)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/07/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 56 Request for a Status Conference is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/16/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff may file his Second Amended Complaint within 10 days of the filing of this Order; and Defendant shall file its Answer within 10 calendar days of the filing date of the Second Amended Complaint. (Reader, L)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RECUSAL ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/14 ORDERING All currently scheduled dates in the above-captioned cases are VACATED; The Clerk of the Court reassign these cases to another judge for all further proceedings, making appropriate adjustments in the assignments of civil cases to compensate for such reassignments; and these cases are REASSIGNED to the Honorable Troy L. Nunley, United States District Judge. (Becknal, R)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/14 ORDERING Pursuant to the agreement of the parties reached during a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference held in chambers on February 3, 2014, this matter is STAYED until after the trial is completed in Campbell v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, 2:06-cv- 2376 (E.D. Cal.). (Becknal, R)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/12/13 ORDERING that a Further Status Conference is SET for 1/27/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The parties shall file updated status reports 14 days preceding the status conference. (Kastilahn, A)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/22/13 ORDERING Defendant's motion to transfer this case to the Central District of California is DENIED; Defendant's un-opposed motion to strike the Complaint's requests for injunctive relief and for punitive or exemplary damages is GRANTED; and Defendant's motion to strike Paragraphs 1, 4, 9 and 18 of the Complaint is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/17/2013 GRANTING 25 Ex Parte Application. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED TO 11/12/2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton.(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamov v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yury Adamov
Represented By: William A. Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?