Harris v. Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Seth D. Harris
Defendant: Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc., Country Elegance, Inc., Bilby Home, Inc. and Jaime G Gacilan
Case Number: 2:2013cv01308
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 (a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/6/2014 ORDERING the defendants to pay the Secretary of Labor, jointly and severally, $31,207.68 plus $13,462.31 as liquidated damages; ENTERING JUDGMENT against the defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $44,669.99 in favor of the plaintiff, Secretary of Labor; ORDERING the defendants to pay the Secretary of Labor $900.00 in Civil Money Penalties within 15 days; ORDERING each party to bear all fees and expenses (including court costs) and attorneys' fees that might be available under the Equal Access to Justice Act incurred by such party in connection with any stage of this proceeding to date; ORDERING that this Court retain jurisdiction of this action for purposes of enforcing compliance with terms of the Consent Decree. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
October 27, 2014 Filing 18 Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (ECF No. 17) scheduled for hearing on 10/30/2014, is submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date.(Deutsch, S)
September 19, 2014 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE CONSENT JUDGMENT by Seth D. Harris. Motion Hearing SET for 10/30/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Judgment and Order) (Botts, Benjamin) Modified on 9/22/2014 (Michel, G).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/27/2014: All Discovery shall be completed by 4/8/2015. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 6/8/2015. The last day to hear Dispositive Motions shall be 10/1/2015. Any Evidentiary or Procedure Motions to be filed by 11/25/2015. Oppositions must be filed by 12/3/2015 and any Reply are due 12/10/2015. Motion will be heard at the same time as Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Parties shall file a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement no later than 11/25/2015 and their Trial Briefs by 12/3/2015. This Scheduling Order will become final unless Objections are filed within 7 court days of service. (Marciel, M)
December 2, 2013 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bilby Home, Inc., Country Elegance, Inc., Jaime G Gacilan, Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc.. (Shimoda, Galen)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/13: The filing deadline for the joint Rule 26 status report is EXTENDED until December 2, 2013.(Kaminski, H)
October 29, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Deadline to File Rule 26 Joint Status Report re #3 Civil New Case Documents for MCE by Seth D. Harris. (Botts, Benjamin)
October 11, 2013 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Bilby Home, Inc., Country Elegance, Inc., Jaime G Gacilan, Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc.. Attorney Shimoda, Galen T. added.(Shimoda, Galen)
October 1, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Unvailability by Seth D. Harris. (Botts, Benjamin)
September 25, 2013 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Seth D. Harris re #3 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Botts, Benjamin)
September 25, 2013 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Seth D. Harris re #6 Waiver of Service Executed, #5 Waiver of Service Executed, #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #8 Waiver of Service Executed. Attorney Botts, Benjamin Richard added. (Botts, Benjamin)
September 18, 2013 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc. Waiver sent on 8/14/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Botts, Benjamin)
September 18, 2013 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Jaime G Gacilan Waiver sent on 8/14/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Botts, Benjamin)
September 18, 2013 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Country Elegance, Inc. Waiver sent on 8/14/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Botts, Benjamin) Modified on 9/19/2013 (Zignago, K.).
September 18, 2013 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Bilby Home, Inc. Waiver sent on 8/14/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Botts, Benjamin) Modified on 9/19/2013 (Zignago, K.).
July 1, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bilby Home, Inc., Country Elegance, Inc., Jaime G Gacilan, Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Cheryl L. Adams* *Benjamin R. Botts* *90 7th Street, Suite 3-700* *San Francisco, CA 94103*. (Meuleman, A)
July 1, 2013 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Meuleman, A)
July 1, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Seth D. Harris (Adams, Cheryl)
June 28, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of Fair Labor Standards Act against All Defendants by Seth D. Harris.(Adams, Cheryl) Modified on 7/1/2013 (Meuleman, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth D. Harris
Represented By: Cheryl L Adams, GOVT
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocampo Gacilan Home, Inc.
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Elegance, Inc.
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilby Home, Inc.
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime G Gacilan
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?