McCrary v. Campbell Soup Supply Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Danny McCrary
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company and Campbell Soup Supply Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01332
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/18/2014 ORDERING that this case is REMANDED to the Superior Court for the State of California, in the County of San Joaquin. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/10/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's deadline to file his MOTION for Class Certification is CONTINUED from 5/1/14 to 8/9/2014.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/28/14: Defendant shall cause the First Amended Answer to be filed within ten days of the entry of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/23/13. Defendant, Campbell Soup Supply Company LLC, by and through its undersigned counsel, and Plaintiff, Danny McCrary, by and through his undersigned counsel, hereby agree to the entry of the Protective Order below. (Becknal, R)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/23/13: The status (pretrial scheduling) conference scheduled for hearing on October 28, 2013, is vacated. Status (pretrial scheduling) Conference is continued to 8/18/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/2/2013 ORDERING 14 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be the operative complaint in this matter; Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be DEEMED filed upon entry of the Order on this Stipulation; and Defendant shall have 30 days to respond to the Second Amended Complaint to commence upon entry of this Order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrary v. Campbell Soup Supply Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company
Represented By: Ronald W Brown
Represented By: Meggi Elspeth Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Soup Supply Company, LLC
Represented By: Ronald W Brown
Represented By: Meggi Elspeth Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny McCrary
Represented By: Alex Paul Katofsky
Represented By: Kenneth Steven Gaines
Represented By: Daniel Franklin Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?