Sarmiento v. Hill
Petitioner: Samuel Sarmiento
Respondent: Rick Hill
Case Number: 2:2013cv01338
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/8/2017 RECOMMENDING petitioner's 1 application for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction for the reasons set forth in the court's 5/5/2017 order. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/21/17 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction for the reasons set forth in the court's 5/05/17 order 29 . Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/5/2017 FINDING 27 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Petitioner does not demonstrate a basis for habeas jurisdiction. Petitioner to convert habeas petition into civil rights action and file amended complaint within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/01/16 ordering that within thirty days of service of this order, petitioner shall file a document captioned Response To Order to Show Cause, explaining why this court has jurisdiction over his habeas petition. Respondent may file an optional reply to the response to the order to show cause within fourteen days thereafter. (Plummer, M) Modified on 12/2/2016 (Plummer, M).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/24/16 ordering that within fourteen days of service of this order petitioner shall return the attached form advising the court whether he would like to: 1. Respond, explaining why Nettles does no t prevent this court from exercising jurisdiction over his habeas petition,2. Convert his habeas petition into a § 1983 claim, or 3. Dismiss this action without prejudice to refiling his claim as a § 1983 claim, subject to any statute of limitations issues. (Plummer, M) Modified on 10/25/2016 (Plummer, M).
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/15/2014 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 are ADOPTED in FULL; Respondent's 10 motion to dismiss petitioner's federal habeas corpus petition is DENIED; and respondent are ORDERED to file an answer within 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/01/14 recommending that respondent's motion to dismiss petitioner's habeas corpus petition 10 be denied and that respondent be ordered to file an answer within 60 days from the date of the district judge's review and adoption of the instant findings and recommendations. Motion to Dismiss 10 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarmiento v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Sarmiento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Hill
Represented By: Andrew Robert Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?