Rose, et al v. County of Sacramento, et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Rose, Karen Rose and Estate of Jonathan Rose
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Scott Jones and David McEntire
Case Number: 2:2013cv01339
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/18/2018 DISMISSING this action in its entirety with prejudice. (Huang, H)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/24/18 ORDERING that any motion for attorney fees shall be filed on or before December 3, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/26/2018 EXTENDING the deadline to file a Motion for Attorney Fees to 10/31/2018. (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/2018 ORDERING that any motion for attorney fees shall be filed by 10/3/2018. (Zignago, K.)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION and ORDER for stay of enforcement of judgment and to set deadline for Motion to file attorney fees signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/28/18. The parties stipulate that any Motion for Attorney fees shall be filed on or before 9/19/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/7/2018 ORDERING 166 Defendants' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment is hereby GRANTED, the judgment shall be altered to strike the award of two million dollars to the successors-in-interest of Theodore Rose, Jr.; Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is hereby DENIED as procedurally improper; and Defendants' Motion for a New Trial is hereby DENIED. The stay of judgment in this matter is hereby LIFTED and judgment shall take effect. (Reader, L)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/24/18, ORDERING that the enforcement of judgment is STAYED until the resolution of any and all post trial motions. Any motion for attorney fees shall be due 28 days from the Court's order deciding 166 Motion to Amend 153 the Judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/28/2017 CONTINUING hearing on Defendants' 166 Motion to Amend the Judgment to 1/25/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Plaintiffs' opposition due 1/4/2018 and Defendants' reply due 1/18/2018. (Zignago, K.)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/20/2017 ORDERING a STAY of enforcement of judgment, without the posting of a bond, through the resolution of any and all post-trial motions. Any motion for attorney fees shall be due by 12/11/2017 or 20 days from the entry of judgment on any post-trial motions, whichever is later. (Zignago, K.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/05/17 ORDERING that the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in this matter in accordance with the 146 jury verdict and the 149 substitution order. (Benson, A.)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/4/2017 ORDERING 149 that the following persons are substituted as plaintiffs in this action nunc pro tunc, for and in place of the deceased Plaintiff Theodore Milton Rose: Karen Rose as successor in interest to Theodore Milton Rose; Theodore Alton Rose, III as successor in interest to Theodore Milton Rose; and Tiffany Elaine Rose as successor in interest to Theodore Milton Rose. (Reader, L)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/14/17 GRANTING 119 the Foundation of Exhibits.(Becknal, R)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/16/16. (Kaminski, H)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/14/15 re: 25 ORDERING Partial Dismissal. In consideration of the foregoing, the parties stipulate that the following claims and/or defendant shall be dismissed, with prejudice, wi th each party to bear its respective attorneys' fees and costs: 1. The state law- wrongful death claim based upon California Government Code § 845.6 (Fifth Claim For Relief part b.) be dismissed; 2. The state law- wrongful death claim based upon negligent supervision, training, hiring and retention (Fifth Claim For Relief part a.) be dismissed;2. The Fourth Claim for Relief for supervisory liability claim be dismissed; and, 3. All claims against Sheriff Scott Jones in his individual an d official capacities be dismissed. To be clear, the parties do not intend this stipulation to include a dismissal of the Third Claim for Relief alleging, in part, a failure to supervise. Scott Jones (Sacramento County Sheriff) DISMISSED with prejudice. (Meuleman, A)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/6/2014 MODIFYING the 11 Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING that the initial disclosure of experts be completed by 11/14/2014; ORDERING that the supplemental disclosure of experts be completed by 11/28/2014. (Michel, G)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER For Extension of time for Discovery, Initial and Supplemental Disclosure of Expert witnesses and Hearing date on Dispositive Motions signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/24/14. Non-Expert Discovery deadline CONTINUED from 9/25/14 until 10/23/14. Initial Disclosure of Experts from 10/10/14 until 11/7/14. Supplemental Disclosure of Experts from 10/24/14 until 11/21/14. Hearing date on Dispositive Motions from 1/15/15 until 2/12/15. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/24/14. (Meuleman, A)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/14 re: 12 EXTENDING Time for Discovery, Initial and Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/10/2014, Discovery due by 8/14/2014, Supplemental Disclosure of Experts due 10/24/14. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose, et al v. County of Sacramento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Rose
Represented By: Moseley Cary Collins, III
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Rose
Represented By: Moseley Cary Collins, III
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jonathan Rose
Represented By: Moseley Cary Collins, III
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McEntire
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?